Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 350 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 350 Week
» 17686 Month
» 295482 Year
» 1179863 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2160 m/e 10/1919
LNER (1924) 6640   16/06/1927
LNER (1946) 3899   07/07/1946
BR 63899 w/e 04/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/310/1919
O4/805/09/1955
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L714
Works Number 22250
To Service During 10/1919
Taken into Stock 16/06/1927
Withdrawal Sat 25/05/1963 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 43 yrs, 7 mths , 25 dys
Information Atlas Works

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 29/5/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
WFD Woodford Halse 16/06/1927
STV Staveley (G.C.) 07/05/1944
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
CLK Colwick 01/02/1948
ANN Annesley 06/06/1948
38A Colwick 05/02/1950
39A Gorton 21/05/1950
38A Colwick 21/06/1953
38D Staveley (G.C.) 29/11/1953
   Withdrawn 25/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 07/02/1948
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 12/06/1948
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 21/05/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 26/12/1953
WDN   25/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1077)
24/03/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1457)
17/06/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 42)
07/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3218)
13/11/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1275)
29/06/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1464)
03/03/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3257)
18/05/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3385)
04/12/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1232)
20/01/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22110)
29/11/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22118)
05/09/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28392)
09/08/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28885)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 30/04/1927 16/06/1927 48 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6640
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1929 25/07/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 31/01/1931 24/03/1931 53 days General
Boiler number 1457 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/05/1933 17/06/1933 42 days General
Boiler number 42 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1935 07/11/1935 46 days General
lntensifore removed
Boiler number 3218 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1937 13/11/1937 24 days General
Chimney altered
Boiler number 1275 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/05/1940 29/06/1940 35 days General
Boiler number 1464 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 11/10/1942 18/02/1943 131 days General  
Gorton Works 28/01/1945 03/03/1945 35 days General
Boiler number 3257 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/04/1947 18/05/1947 42 days General
Boiler number 3385 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/10/1948 04/12/1948 46 days General
Boiler number 1232 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63899
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1949 24/12/1949 27 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 29/12/1949 30/12/1949 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 01/01/1951 20/01/1951 20 days General
Boiler number 22110 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/11/1952 29/11/1952 20 days General
Boiler number 22118 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1955 05/09/1955 69 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28392 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 04/11/1957 23/11/1957 20 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 16/06/1958 09/08/1958 55 days General
Boiler number 28885 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1958 30/08/1958 13 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 26/09/1961 04/11/1961 40 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2160
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22250
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
30/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1927. Dep: 16/06/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6640
   
16/06/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
16/06/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
20/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1929. Dep: 25/07/1929.    
31/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1931. Dep: 24/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1457 (Diagram 15)
   
07/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1933. Dep: 17/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 42 (Diagram 15)
   
23/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1935. Dep: 07/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
lntensifore removed
Boiler number 3218 (Diagram 15)
   
21/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1937. Dep: 13/11/1937.
Work undertaken:
Chimney altered
Boiler number 1275 (Diagram 15)
   
26/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1940. Dep: 29/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1464 (Diagram 15)
   
11/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1942. Dep: 18/02/1943.    
07/05/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
28/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3257 (Diagram 15)
   
07/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3899    
07/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1947. Dep: 18/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3385 (Diagram 15)
   
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
01/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
06/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
20/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1948. Dep: 04/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1232 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63899
   
28/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/11/1949. Dep: 24/12/1949.    
29/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/12/1949. Dep: 30/12/1949.    
05/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
01/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1951. Dep: 20/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22110 (Diagram 15)
   
10/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1952. Dep: 29/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22118 (Diagram 15)
   
21/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
29/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
29/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1955. Dep: 05/09/1955.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28392 (Diagram 100A)
   
04/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/11/1957. Dep: 23/11/1957.    
16/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1958. Dep: 09/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28885 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/08/1958. Dep: 30/08/1958.    
26/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/09/1961. Dep: 04/11/1961.    
25/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63899 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev