Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 108 Today
» 936 Yesterday
» 2969 Week
» 20305 Month
» 298101 Year
» 1182482 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2162 m/e 11/1919
LNER (1924) 6641   20/08/1927
LNER (1946) 3900   18/08/1946
BR 63900 w/e 25/02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L714
Works Number 22252
To Service During 11/1919
Taken into Stock 18/08/1927
Withdrawal Sun 23/09/1962 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
Service Life 42 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys
Information Atlas Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Round Oak Steel, Brierley Hill, 4/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
WFD Woodford Halse 18/08/1927
DON Doncaster 28/09/1928
WFD Woodford Halse 04/12/1928
STV Staveley (G.C.) 19/06/1937
WFD Woodford Halse 07/05/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 07/04/1946
DON Doncaster 27/10/1946
40E Langwith Junction 25/06/1950
40B Immingham 02/12/1951
40E Colwick 10/04/1960
   Withdrawn 23/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 16/04/1960
WDN   23/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1148)
24/05/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1030)
07/11/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1353)
14/04/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 820)
19/09/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 803)
19/09/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
11/03/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3362)
07/06/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3241)
31/07/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3248)
08/09/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3402)
06/09/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3387)
25/02/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3226)
26/04/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22119)
06/11/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22236)
24/05/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22262)
08/08/1959 Water Treatment apparatus fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 21/05/1927 20/08/1927 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6641
 
Gorton Works 26/04/1930 24/05/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 1030 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/10/1931 07/11/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1353 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1934 14/04/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 820 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/08/1936 19/09/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 803 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1939 11/03/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 3362 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/05/1941 07/06/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 3241 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/07/1943 31/07/1943 13 days General
Boiler number 3248 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/08/1945 08/09/1945 15 days General
Boiler number 3402 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/08/1947 06/09/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 3387 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/02/1950 25/02/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63900
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1952 26/04/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 22119 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/04/1952 30/04/1952 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 09/10/1954 06/11/1954 29 days General
Boiler number 22236 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/09/1956 15/09/1956 15 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 19/09/1956 22/09/1956 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 26/04/1958 24/05/1958 29 days General
Boiler number 22262 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1959 08/08/1959 6 days Unclassified
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2162
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22252
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
21/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1927. Dep: 20/08/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6641
   
18/08/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
18/08/1927 To Stock To ROD stock    
28/09/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
04/12/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
26/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1930. Dep: 24/05/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1030 (Diagram 15)
   
17/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1931. Dep: 07/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1353 (Diagram 15)
   
31/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1934. Dep: 14/04/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 820 (Diagram 15)
   
29/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1936. Dep: 19/09/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 803 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
19/06/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
04/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1939. Dep: 11/03/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3362 (Diagram 15)
   
24/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1941. Dep: 07/06/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3241 (Diagram 15)
   
19/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1943. Dep: 31/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3248 (Diagram 15)
   
07/05/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
25/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3402 (Diagram 15)
   
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
18/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3900    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
16/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1947. Dep: 06/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3387 (Diagram 15)
   
11/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1950. Dep: 25/02/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63900
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
02/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
12/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1952. Dep: 26/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22119 (Diagram 15)
   
29/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/04/1952. Dep: 30/04/1952.    
09/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1954. Dep: 06/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22236 (Diagram 15)
   
01/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/09/1956. Dep: 15/09/1956.    
19/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/09/1956. Dep: 22/09/1956.    
26/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1958. Dep: 24/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22262 (Diagram 15)
   
03/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/08/1959. Dep: 08/08/1959.
Work undertaken:
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
   
10/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
23/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63900 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev