Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 748 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1788 Week
» 11958 Month
» 289754 Year
» 1174135 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2165 m/e 12/1919
LNER (1924) 6642   11/06/1927
LNER (1946) 3901   07/04/1946
BR 63901 w/e 04/02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/312/1919
O127/10/1945
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L714
Works Number 22255
To Service During 12/1919
Taken into Stock 07/06/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Service Life 42 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys
Information Atlas Works

Notes
Notes Into Crewe for cutting up 8/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
WFD Woodford Halse 07/06/1927
DON Doncaster 25/09/1928
WFD Woodford Halse 28/11/1928
IMM Immingham 20/02/1930
TUX Tuxford 24/02/1930
FRO Frodingham 30/11/1933
GOR Gorton 04/11/1945
38B Annesley 02/07/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 02/07/1950
LOAN 16D Annesley 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1066)
24/10/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1960)
21/10/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1279)
01/02/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1474)
01/02/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
01/02/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
21/05/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1458)
07/09/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3335)
26/06/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1231)
27/10/1945 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5045)
02/1946 Drop Grate fitted
21/12/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5024)
04/02/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5012)
05/04/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28375)
03/02/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28372)
18/02/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28396)
17/05/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28373)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 19/03/1927 11/06/1927 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6642
 
Gorton Works 02/11/1929 07/12/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 03/10/1931 24/10/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1960 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/10/1933 21/10/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1279 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1936 01/02/1936 15 days General
Boiler number C1474 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 07/05/1938 21/05/1938 15 days General
Chimney altered
Boiler number 1458 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/08/1940 07/09/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 3335 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1943 26/06/1943 15 days General
Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1945 27/10/1945 85 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5045 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 1946 02/1946   Unclassified
Drop Grate fitted
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1946 17/08/1946 59 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 11/11/1947 21/12/1947 41 days General
Boiler number 5024 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 10/01/1950 04/02/1950 26 days General
Boiler number 5012 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63901
 
Gorton Works 07/02/1950 13/02/1950 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 20/02/1952 05/04/1952 46 days General
Boiler number 28375 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 04/07/1952 09/08/1952 37 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 08/01/1954 03/02/1954 27 days General
Boiler number 28372 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 07/01/1955 12/02/1955 37 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 13/01/1956 18/02/1956 37 days General
Boiler number 28396 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1958 17/05/1958 34 days General
Boiler number 28373 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1961 25/11/1961 46 days Light Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2165
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22255
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
19/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1927. Dep: 11/06/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6642
   
07/06/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
07/06/1927 To Stock To ROD stock    
25/09/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
28/11/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
02/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1929. Dep: 07/12/1929.    
20/02/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
24/02/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX)    
03/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1931. Dep: 24/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1960 (Diagram 15)
   
14/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1933. Dep: 21/10/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1279 (Diagram 15)
   
30/11/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
18/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1936. Dep: 01/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1474 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
07/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1938. Dep: 21/05/1938.
Work undertaken:
Chimney altered
Boiler number 1458 (Diagram 15)
   
31/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1940. Dep: 07/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3335 (Diagram 15)
   
12/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1943. Dep: 26/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15)
   
04/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1945. Dep: 27/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5045 (Diagram 100A)
   
04/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: ?/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Drop Grate fitted
   
07/04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3901    
20/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/06/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946.    
11/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1947. Dep: 21/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5024 (Diagram 100A)
   
10/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1950. Dep: 04/02/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5012 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63901
   
07/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/02/1950. Dep: 13/02/1950.    
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
20/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1952. Dep: 05/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28375 (Diagram 100A)
   
04/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/07/1952. Dep: 09/08/1952.    
08/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1954. Dep: 03/02/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28372 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/01/1955. Dep: 12/02/1955.    
13/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1956. Dep: 18/02/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28396 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1958. Dep: 17/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28373 (Diagram 100A)
   
11/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 11/10/1961. Dep: 25/11/1961.    
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63901 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev