|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 19/03/1927 | 11/06/1927 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6642 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/11/1929 | 07/12/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1931 | 24/10/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1960 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/10/1933 | 21/10/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1279 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1936 | 01/02/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number C1474 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/05/1938 | 21/05/1938 | 15 days | General | Chimney altered Boiler number 1458 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1940 | 07/09/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3335 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1943 | 26/06/1943 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1945 | 27/10/1945 | 85 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5045 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 1946 | 02/1946 | Unclassified | Drop Grate fitted |
|||
Gorton Works | 20/06/1946 | 17/08/1946 | 59 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1947 | 21/12/1947 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 5024 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/01/1950 | 04/02/1950 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 5012 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63901 |
||
Gorton Works | 07/02/1950 | 13/02/1950 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 20/02/1952 | 05/04/1952 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28375 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/07/1952 | 09/08/1952 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 08/01/1954 | 03/02/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28372 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/01/1955 | 12/02/1955 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1956 | 18/02/1956 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28396 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/04/1958 | 17/05/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28373 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1961 | 25/11/1961 | 46 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1962 | Annesley MPD | The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. | SLS/196212 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2165 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22255 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
19/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1927. Dep: 11/06/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6642 |
||
07/06/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
07/06/1927 | To Stock | To ROD stock | ||
25/09/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
28/11/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
02/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1929. Dep: 07/12/1929. | ||
20/02/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
24/02/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX) | ||
03/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1931. Dep: 24/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1960 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1933. Dep: 21/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1279 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/11/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
18/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1936. Dep: 01/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1474 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
07/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1938. Dep: 21/05/1938. Work undertaken: Chimney altered Boiler number 1458 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1940. Dep: 07/09/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3335 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1943. Dep: 26/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1945. Dep: 27/10/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5045 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: ?/02/1946. Work undertaken: Drop Grate fitted |
||
07/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3901 | ||
20/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/06/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946. | ||
11/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1947. Dep: 21/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5024 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1950. Dep: 04/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5012 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63901 |
||
07/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/02/1950. Dep: 13/02/1950. | ||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
20/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1952. Dep: 05/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28375 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/07/1952. Dep: 09/08/1952. | ||
08/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1954. Dep: 03/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28372 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/01/1955. Dep: 12/02/1955. | ||
13/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1956. Dep: 18/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28396 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1958. Dep: 17/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28373 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 11/10/1961. Dep: 25/11/1961. | ||
17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63901 from Annesley (16D) |