Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 772 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 772 Week
» 18108 Month
» 295904 Year
» 1180285 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1636 m/e 07/1919
LNER (1924) 6312   16/02/1924
War Dept. 778   11/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E109
Works Number 3756
To Service During 07/1919
Taken into Stock 16/02/1924
Withdrawal Sat 11/10/1941 off Woodford Halse (WFD)
Service Life 22 yrs, 3 mths , 11 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 778 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 23/02/1924
LNG Langwith Junction 03/03/1927
CLK Colwick 04/03/1927
LNG Langwith Junction 14/03/1927
WFD Woodford Halse 07/04/1927
   Withdrawn 11/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1219)
19/07/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1374)
19/10/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1154)
18/07/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1478)
07/10/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1161)
21/09/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 819)
09/10/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1080)
01/07/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3374)
11/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 940)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/02/1924 16/02/1924 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6312
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1924 19/07/1924 64 days General
Boiler number 1374 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/12/1926 12/02/1927 57 days General  
Gorton Works 24/08/1929 19/10/1929 57 days General
Boiler number 1154 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/06/1931 18/07/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1478 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/09/1933 07/10/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1161 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/08/1935 21/09/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 819 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/09/1937 09/10/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1080 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/06/1939 01/07/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3374 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1941 11/10/1941 18 days General
Boiler number 940 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 778
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1636
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3756
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
02/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 16/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6312
   
16/02/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
23/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
17/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1924. Dep: 19/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1374 (Diagram 15)
   
18/12/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1926. Dep: 12/02/1927.    
03/03/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
04/03/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
14/03/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
07/04/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
24/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1929. Dep: 19/10/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1154 (Diagram 15)
   
27/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1931. Dep: 18/07/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1478 (Diagram 15)
   
30/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1933. Dep: 07/10/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1161 (Diagram 15)
   
31/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1935. Dep: 21/09/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 819 (Diagram 15)
   
25/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1937. Dep: 09/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1080 (Diagram 15)
   
17/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1939. Dep: 01/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3374 (Diagram 15)
   
24/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1941. Dep: 11/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 940 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 778
   
11/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 778 from Woodford Halse (WFD)    

prev prev