|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/04/1924 | 05/07/1924 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6330 |
||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1926 | 15/01/1927 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/06/1928 | 14/07/1928 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1930 | 04/10/1930 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1026 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/07/1932 | 30/07/1932 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/05/1934 | 19/05/1934 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1310 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/07/1934 | 14/07/1934 | 8 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 30/05/1936 | 13/06/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3244 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/01/1939 | 28/01/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3215 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/09/1941 | 20/09/1941 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 3273 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 744 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1638 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3757 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
05/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 05/07/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6330 |
||
03/07/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
05/07/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
20/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1926. Dep: 15/01/1927. | ||
09/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1928. Dep: 14/07/1928. | ||
30/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1930. Dep: 04/10/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1026 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1932. Dep: 30/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1934. Dep: 19/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1310 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/07/1934. Dep: 14/07/1934. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
30/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1936. Dep: 13/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3244 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
07/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1939. Dep: 28/01/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3215 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3273 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 744 |
||
19/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 744 from Gorton (GOR) |