Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 828 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 3388 Week
» 16421 Month
» 238822 Year
» 1123203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1641 m/e 08/1919
LNWR 2832 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6328   13/08/1924
LNER (1946) 3725   09/06/1946
BR 63725 w/e 20/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/208/1919
O131/03/1945
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E109
Works Number 3759
To Service During 08/1919
Taken into Stock 13/08/1924
Withdrawal Sun 11/07/1965 off Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)
Scrapping Mon 04/10/1965 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 45 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to A Draper, Hull. Cut up 4/10/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD (returned from loan)   08/1921
DFU Dunfermline Upper (New to Stock) 13/08/1924
LNG Langwith Junction 24/07/1943
GOR Gorton 15/04/1945
CLK Colwick 18/08/1946
GOR Gorton 20/10/1946
38B Annesley 26/11/1950
15A Wellingborough 15/07/1956
38B Annesley 16/12/1956
31B March 24/02/1957
41H Staveley (G.C.) 24/11/1963
41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn 11/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
LOAN 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 21/07/1956
LOAN 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 11/08/1956
EXLOAN 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 29/12/1956
EXLOAN 38B Annesley 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 25/11/1963
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1471)
25/05/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1472)
16/10/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1102)
14/12/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3413)
24/07/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3257)
31/03/1945 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5031)
24/05/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5081)
20/08/1949 Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
20/08/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5009)
01/12/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28363)
19/12/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28351)
25/02/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28316)
27/09/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28289)
30/08/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28300)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 21/02/1924 13/08/1924 175 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6328
 
Cowlairs Works 22/04/1926 16/09/1926 148 days General  
Cowlairs Works 06/11/1928 11/01/1929 67 days General  
Cowlairs Works 27/06/1929 11/07/1929 15 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 28/08/1929 17/09/1929 21 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 13/02/1931 25/04/1931 72 days General  
Gorton Works 10/04/1935 25/05/1935 46 days General
Boiler number C1472 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/10/1937 16/10/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1102 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1940 14/12/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 3413 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1943 24/07/1943 19 days General
Boiler number 3257 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/12/1944 31/03/1945 92 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5031 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1947 24/05/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 5081 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/08/1949 20/08/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 5009 (Diagram 100A)
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
Renumbered to BR 63725
 
Gorton Works 03/11/1951 01/12/1951 29 days General
Boiler number 28363 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 22/11/1952 27/12/1952 36 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 28/11/1953 19/12/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 28351 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 18/12/1954 22/01/1955 36 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 28/01/1956 25/02/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 28316 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 30/08/1958 27/09/1958 29 days General
Boiler number 28289 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 24/01/1959 07/02/1959 15 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 19/12/1959 16/01/1960 29 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 19/06/1962 30/08/1962 73 days General
Boiler number 28300 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1641
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3759
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2832    
08/1921 Allocation      
21/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1924. Dep: 13/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6328
   
13/08/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
22/04/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1926. Dep: 16/09/1926.    
06/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1928. Dep: 11/01/1929.    
27/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/06/1929. Dep: 11/07/1929.    
28/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/08/1929. Dep: 17/09/1929.    
13/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1931. Dep: 25/04/1931.    
10/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1935. Dep: 25/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1472 (Diagram 15)
   
02/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1937. Dep: 16/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1102 (Diagram 15)
   
30/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1940. Dep: 14/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3413 (Diagram 15)
   
06/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1943. Dep: 24/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3257 (Diagram 15)
   
24/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
30/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1944. Dep: 31/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5031 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/04/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3725    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
03/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1947. Dep: 24/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5081 (Diagram 100A)
   
06/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1949. Dep: 20/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5009 (Diagram 100A)
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
Renumbered to BR 63725
   
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
03/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1951. Dep: 01/12/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28363 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/11/1952. Dep: 27/12/1952.    
28/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1953. Dep: 19/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28351 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/12/1954. Dep: 22/01/1955.    
28/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1956. Dep: 25/02/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28316 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
16/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
24/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
30/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1958. Dep: 27/09/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28289 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/01/1959. Dep: 07/02/1959.    
19/12/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/12/1959. Dep: 16/01/1960.    
19/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1962. Dep: 30/08/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28300 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
26/09/1964 Sightings Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Hauled a class 8 Up goods, a Class 8 John Thickitt Link
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
11/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63725 from Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
04/10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev