Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 567 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6376 Week
» 13560 Month
» 321541 Year
» 1205922 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1737 m/e 10/1919
LNER (1924) 6500   15/10/1925
LNER (1946) 3726   13/10/1946
BR 63726 w/e 26/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/310/1919
O4/502/09/1939
O4/825/01/1958
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E109
Works Number 3764
To Service During 10/1919
Taken into Stock 15/10/1925
Withdrawal Thu 23/04/1964 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping Hesslewoods (Attercliffe)
Service Life 44 yrs, 6 mths , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to W Hesslewoods, Attercliffe, 6/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 15/10/1925
IMM Immingham 24/10/1925
DON Doncaster 21/10/1940
GOR Gorton 04/02/1943
MEX Mexborough 20/08/1944
IMM Immingham 16/09/1945
FRO Frodingham 12/05/1946
36D Barnsley 17/08/1952
41F Mexborough 03/01/1960
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 23/07/1961
   Withdrawn 23/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36D Barnsley 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 05/08/1961
WDN   23/04/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1135)
08/05/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1155)
12/11/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 858)
22/12/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1355)
10/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 866)
02/09/1939 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 3652)
06/05/1944 Diagram 16A boiler fitted (number 615)
02/02/1946 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 3651)
02/07/1948 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 3653)
17/02/1951 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 22340)
25/01/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28945)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 06/08/1925 15/10/1925 71 days Heavy
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6500
 
Gorton Works 02/01/1928 06/03/1928 65 days General  
Gorton Works 19/03/1930 08/05/1930 51 days General
Boiler number 1155 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/10/1932 12/11/1932 35 days General
Boiler number 858 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/11/1934 22/12/1934 37 days General
Boiler number 1355 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/05/1937 10/07/1937 43 days General
Boiler number 866 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1939 02/09/1939 57 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/5
Boiler number 3652 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1941 08/09/1941 26 days General  
Gorton Works 08/07/1942 10/10/1942 95 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 23/04/1944 06/05/1944 14 days General
Boiler number 615 (Diagram 16A)
 
Gorton Works 09/12/1945 02/02/1946 56 days General
Boiler number 3651 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 24/05/1948 02/07/1948 40 days General
Boiler number 3653 (Diagram 15A)
Renumbered to BR 63726
 
Gorton Works 12/10/1949 12/11/1949 32 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 21/01/1951 17/02/1951 28 days General
Boiler number 22340 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1951 23/02/1951 6 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 04/03/1951 06/03/1951 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 30/01/1952 22/03/1952 53 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 20/11/1952 28/11/1952 9 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 23/12/1953 30/01/1954 39 days General  
Gorton Works 23/09/1955 15/10/1955 23 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 25/07/1956 11/08/1956 18 days General  
Gorton Works 07/12/1957 25/01/1958 50 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28945 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 15/09/1961 31/10/1961 47 days Light Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1737
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3764
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
06/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/08/1925. Dep: 15/10/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6500
   
15/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
15/10/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
24/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
02/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1928. Dep: 06/03/1928.    
19/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1930. Dep: 08/05/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1155 (Diagram 15)
   
09/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1932. Dep: 12/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 858 (Diagram 15)
   
16/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1934. Dep: 22/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1355 (Diagram 15)
   
29/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1937. Dep: 10/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 866 (Diagram 15)
   
08/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1939. Dep: 02/09/1939.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/5
Boiler number 3652 (Diagram 15A)
   
21/10/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
14/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1941. Dep: 08/09/1941.    
08/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/07/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942.    
04/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
23/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1944. Dep: 06/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 615 (Diagram 16A)
   
20/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
16/09/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
09/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1945. Dep: 02/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3651 (Diagram 15A)
   
12/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
13/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3726    
24/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1948. Dep: 02/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3653 (Diagram 15A)
Renumbered to BR 63726
   
12/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 12/10/1949. Dep: 12/11/1949.    
21/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1951. Dep: 17/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22340 (Diagram 15A)
   
18/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/02/1951. Dep: 23/02/1951.    
04/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/03/1951. Dep: 06/03/1951.    
30/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/01/1952. Dep: 22/03/1952.    
17/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
20/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/11/1952. Dep: 28/11/1952.    
23/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1953. Dep: 30/01/1954.    
23/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/09/1955. Dep: 15/10/1955.    
25/07/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1956. Dep: 11/08/1956.    
07/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1957. Dep: 25/01/1958.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28945 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
23/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
15/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 15/09/1961. Dep: 31/10/1961.    
23/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63726 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev