|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/04/1924 | 07/06/1924 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6327 |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1926 | 12/02/1927 | 44 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1929 | 08/06/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1931 | 27/06/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1279 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/09/1933 | 14/10/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1007 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1935 | 31/08/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 854 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/08/1937 | 04/09/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1955 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1939 | 16/12/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1941 | 18/10/1941 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 3295 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 788 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1738 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3765 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
06/1920 | Allocation | |||
06/1920 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2977 | ||
05/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 07/06/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6327 |
||
07/06/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
07/06/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
31/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1926. Dep: 12/02/1927. | ||
27/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1929. Dep: 08/06/1929. | ||
06/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1931. Dep: 27/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1279 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1933. Dep: 14/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1007 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1935. Dep: 31/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 854 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
14/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1937. Dep: 04/09/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1955 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1939. Dep: 16/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1941. Dep: 18/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3295 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 788 |
||
18/10/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 788 from March (MAR) |