|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 08/03/1924 | 15/03/1924 | 8 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6308 |
||
Gorton Works | 20/05/1924 | 29/07/1924 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1485 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1927 | 19/05/1927 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1929 | 12/11/1929 | 74 days | General | Boiler number 1178 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1932 | 14/10/1932 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 1481 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1935 | 23/03/1935 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 1939 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/05/1937 | 03/07/1937 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3297 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1939 | 23/12/1939 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3306 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/10/1941 | 01/11/1941 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1944 | 12/02/1944 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3279 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/02/1947 | General | |||||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1948 | 21/06/1948 | 45 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63728 |
||
Gorton Works | 20/07/1949 | 13/08/1949 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 1067 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/07/1951 | 01/09/1951 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 22210 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1951 | 10/09/1951 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 08/07/1953 | 15/08/1953 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 22182 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/12/1955 | 25/02/1956 | 75 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28265 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/09/1958 | 11/10/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28310 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/09/1960 | 29/10/1960 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 01/02/1962 | 16/02/1962 | 16 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
23/01/1965 | Doncaster MPD (Waiting works or stored) | Waiting works or stored: 60114/28/57/8, 61212, 62020/33/7/40/51/5/66, 63606/728/906, 90042/469, 92169/70/5/92/8/9. | SLS/196503 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1739 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3766 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
08/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1924. Dep: 15/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6308 |
||
15/03/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
21/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
20/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1924. Dep: 29/07/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1485 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
20/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
16/03/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
31/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1927. Dep: 19/05/1927. | ||
31/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1929. Dep: 12/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1178 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1932. Dep: 14/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1481 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1935. Dep: 23/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1939 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1937. Dep: 03/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3297 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
25/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1939. Dep: 23/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3306 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1941. Dep: 01/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1944. Dep: 12/02/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3279 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/02/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
10/08/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
03/02/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
19/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3728 | ||
15/02/1947 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 1095 boiler fitted | ||
15/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Dep: 15/02/1947. | ||
18/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
24/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
08/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/05/1948. Dep: 21/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63728 |
||
20/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1949. Dep: 13/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1067 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1951. Dep: 01/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22210 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/09/1951. Dep: 10/09/1951. | ||
08/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1953. Dep: 15/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22182 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1955. Dep: 25/02/1956. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28265 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1958. Dep: 11/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28310 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/09/1960. Dep: 29/10/1960. | ||
01/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/02/1962. Dep: 16/02/1962. | ||
20/12/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63728 from Frodingham (36C) |