Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 106 Today
» 1187 Yesterday
» 2420 Week
» 13713 Month
» 278346 Year
» 1499911 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1739 m/e 10/1919
LNER (1924) 6308   15/03/1924
LNER (1946) 3728   19/07/1946
BR 63728 w/e 19/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/310/1919
O4/825/02/1956
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E109
Works Number 3766
To Service During 10/1919
Taken into Stock 15/03/1924
Withdrawal Sun 20/12/1964 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
Service Life 45 yrs, 2 mths , 20 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Cox & Danks, Wadsley Bridge, 2/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1919
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 21/03/1924
ARD Ardsley on 04/02/1925
NWE New England on 20/02/1925
CLK Colwick on 16/03/1925
DON Doncaster on 12/02/1944
WFD Woodford Halse on 10/08/1944
DON Doncaster on 03/02/1946
FRO Frodingham on 18/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 20/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster m/e 28/02/1946
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 24/01/1948
WDN   on 20/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1325)
29/07/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1485)
12/11/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1178)
14/10/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1481)
23/03/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1939)
03/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3297)
03/07/1937 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
23/12/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3306)
01/11/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1950)
12/02/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3279)
15/02/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1095)
13/08/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1067)
01/09/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22210)
15/08/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22182)
25/02/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28265)
11/10/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28310)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 08/03/1924 15/03/1924 8 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6308
 
Gorton Works 20/05/1924 29/07/1924 71 days General
Boiler number 1485 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1927 19/05/1927 50 days General  
Gorton Works 31/08/1929 12/11/1929 74 days General
Boiler number 1178 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1932 14/10/1932 42 days General
Boiler number 1481 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1935 23/03/1935 34 days General
Boiler number 1939 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/05/1937 03/07/1937 36 days General
Boiler number 3297 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1939 23/12/1939 29 days General
Boiler number 3306 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/10/1941 01/11/1941 24 days General
Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1944 12/02/1944 25 days General
Boiler number 3279 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/02/1947   General  
Gorton Works 08/05/1948 21/06/1948 45 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63728
 
Gorton Works 20/07/1949 13/08/1949 25 days General
Boiler number 1067 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/07/1951 01/09/1951 40 days General
Boiler number 22210 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1951 10/09/1951 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 08/07/1953 15/08/1953 39 days General
Boiler number 22182 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/12/1955 25/02/1956 75 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28265 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1958 11/10/1958 34 days General
Boiler number 28310 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 26/09/1960 29/10/1960 34 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 01/02/1962 16/02/1962 16 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1739
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3766
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
08/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1924. Dep: 15/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6308
   
15/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
21/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
20/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1924. Dep: 29/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1485 (Diagram 15)
   
04/02/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
20/02/1925 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
16/03/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
31/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1927. Dep: 19/05/1927.    
31/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1929. Dep: 12/11/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1178 (Diagram 15)
   
03/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1932. Dep: 14/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1481 (Diagram 15)
   
18/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1935. Dep: 23/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1939 (Diagram 15)
   
29/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1937. Dep: 03/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3297 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
25/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1939. Dep: 23/12/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3306 (Diagram 15)
   
09/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1941. Dep: 01/11/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15)
   
19/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1944. Dep: 12/02/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3279 (Diagram 15)
   
12/02/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
10/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
03/02/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
19/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3728    
15/02/1947 Modification Diagram 15 number 1095 boiler fitted    
15/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Dep: 15/02/1947.    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
08/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/05/1948. Dep: 21/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63728
   
20/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1949. Dep: 13/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1067 (Diagram 15)
   
24/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1951. Dep: 01/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22210 (Diagram 15)
   
04/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/09/1951. Dep: 10/09/1951.    
08/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1953. Dep: 15/08/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22182 (Diagram 15)
   
13/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1955. Dep: 25/02/1956.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28265 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1958. Dep: 11/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28310 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/09/1960. Dep: 29/10/1960.    
01/02/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/02/1962. Dep: 16/02/1962.    
20/12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63728 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev