Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 56 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 3877 Week
» 21213 Month
» 299009 Year
» 1183390 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1741 m/e 11/1919
GCR 1309c   29/12/1923
LNER (1924) 6309   03/05/1924
LNER (1946) 3729   18/08/1946
BR 63729 w/e 05/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E109
Works Number 3768
To Service During 11/1919
Taken into Stock 29/12/1923
Withdrawal Tue 31/03/1959 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 39 yrs , 5 mths

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 28/12/1923
ANN Annesley 15/05/1924
LNG Langwith Junction 25/11/1940
CLK Colwick 27/10/1946
40B Immingham 11/05/1952
38A Colwick 20/09/1953
   Withdrawn 31/03/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   31/03/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1131)
03/05/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1172)
27/07/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1179)
30/05/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1941)
11/11/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1116)
07/03/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
07/03/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3233)
12/03/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3319)
06/04/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3213)
17/10/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3382)
14/10/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3301)
30/11/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3288)
12/03/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3328)
24/03/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22170)
17/01/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22127)
02/07/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22167)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/12/1923 29/12/1923 8 days Light Repair
Renumbered to GCR 1309c
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1924 03/05/1924 64 days General
Boiler number 1172 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6309
 
Gorton Works 26/02/1927 16/04/1927 50 days General  
Gorton Works 15/06/1929 27/07/1929 43 days General
Boiler number 1179 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/05/1931 30/05/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1933 11/11/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1116 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/02/1936 07/03/1936 8 days General
Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 26/02/1938 12/03/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 3319 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/03/1940 06/04/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 14/09/1942 17/10/1942 34 days General
Boiler number 3382 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/09/1944 14/10/1944 18 days General
Boiler number 3301 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1946 30/11/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3288 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/05/1948 05/06/1948 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63729
 
Gorton Works 19/02/1949 12/03/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 3328 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/03/1951 24/03/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 22170 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/03/1951 30/03/1951 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 27/12/1952 17/01/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22127 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/05/1955 02/07/1955 43 days General
Boiler number 22167 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/11/1956 01/12/1956 8 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 14/12/1957 18/01/1958 36 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 23/03/1959 23/03/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1741
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3768
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
22/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1923. Dep: 29/12/1923.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to GCR 1309c
   
28/12/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
29/12/1923 To Stock To GCR stock    
01/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1924. Dep: 03/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1172 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6309
   
15/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
26/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1927. Dep: 16/04/1927.    
15/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1929. Dep: 27/07/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1179 (Diagram 15)
   
02/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1931. Dep: 30/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15)
   
28/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1933. Dep: 11/11/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1116 (Diagram 15)
   
29/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1936. Dep: 07/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
26/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1938. Dep: 12/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3319 (Diagram 15)
   
23/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1940. Dep: 06/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15)
   
25/11/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
14/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1942. Dep: 17/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3382 (Diagram 15)
   
27/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1944. Dep: 14/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3301 (Diagram 15)
   
18/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3729    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
09/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3288 (Diagram 15)
   
22/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/05/1948. Dep: 05/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63729
   
19/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1949. Dep: 12/03/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3328 (Diagram 15)
   
03/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1951. Dep: 24/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22170 (Diagram 15)
   
28/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/03/1951. Dep: 30/03/1951.    
11/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
27/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1952. Dep: 17/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22127 (Diagram 15)
   
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
21/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1955. Dep: 02/07/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22167 (Diagram 15)
   
24/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/11/1956. Dep: 01/12/1956.    
14/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/12/1957. Dep: 18/01/1958.    
23/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 23/03/1959. Dep: 23/03/1959.    
31/03/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63729 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev