|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/12/1923 | 29/12/1923 | 8 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to GCR 1309c |
||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1924 | 03/05/1924 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 1172 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6309 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/02/1927 | 16/04/1927 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1929 | 27/07/1929 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1179 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/05/1931 | 30/05/1931 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1933 | 11/11/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1116 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/02/1936 | 07/03/1936 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/02/1938 | 12/03/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3319 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/03/1940 | 06/04/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 14/09/1942 | 17/10/1942 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 22148 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1944 | 14/10/1944 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 3301 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1946 | 30/11/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3288 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/05/1948 | 05/06/1948 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63729 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/02/1949 | 12/03/1949 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3328 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/03/1951 | 24/03/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22170 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1951 | 30/03/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 27/12/1952 | 17/01/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22127 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/05/1955 | 02/07/1955 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 22167 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/11/1956 | 01/12/1956 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 14/12/1957 | 18/01/1958 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 23/03/1959 | 23/03/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/10/1958 | Colwich MPD - stored locomotives | 63729, 63839, 63614, 64976/88, 61739/52/3/4/80, 90005/25/53/288; J50s are going into store as new diesel shunters arrive (D3624/5/6/7 have arrived). | SLS/195811 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1741 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3768 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
22/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1923. Dep: 29/12/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to GCR 1309c |
||
28/12/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
29/12/1923 | To Stock | To GCR stock | ||
01/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1924. Dep: 03/05/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1172 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6309 |
||
15/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
26/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1927. Dep: 16/04/1927. | ||
15/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1929. Dep: 27/07/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1179 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1931. Dep: 30/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1933. Dep: 11/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1116 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1936. Dep: 07/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
26/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1938. Dep: 12/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3319 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1940. Dep: 06/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/11/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
14/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1942. Dep: 17/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22148 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1944. Dep: 14/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3301 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3729 | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
09/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3288 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/05/1948. Dep: 05/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63729 |
||
19/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1949. Dep: 12/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3328 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1951. Dep: 24/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22170 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/03/1951. Dep: 30/03/1951. | ||
11/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
17/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
27/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1952. Dep: 17/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22127 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
21/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1955. Dep: 02/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22167 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/11/1956. Dep: 01/12/1956. | ||
14/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/12/1957. Dep: 18/01/1958. | ||
23/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 23/03/1959. Dep: 23/03/1959. | ||
31/03/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63729 from Colwick (40E) |