Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 350 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 350 Week
» 17686 Month
» 295482 Year
» 1179863 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1746 m/e 12/1919
LNER (1924) 6307   16/02/1924
LNER (1946) 3731   01/09/1946
BR 63731 w/e 22/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/312/1919
O4/808/09/1956
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E109
Works Number 3773
To Service During 12/1919
Taken into Stock 16/02/1924
Withdrawal Tue 29/10/1963 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 43 yrs, 10 mths , 29 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 1/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 21/02/1924
ANN Annesley 21/04/1924
LNG Langwith Junction 05/09/1943
DON Doncaster 24/11/1946
FRO Frodingham 18/01/1948
36D Barnsley 17/08/1952
41J Langwith Junction 29/11/1959
   Withdrawn 29/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster 24/11/1946
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 36D Barnsley 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   29/10/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1222)
29/08/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1142)
28/10/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1319)
22/12/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1188)
22/12/1934 Intensifore lubricator removed
29/08/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3258)
29/08/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
22/10/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 930)
28/09/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1275)
24/01/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3403)
17/03/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1959)
02/11/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3238)
22/01/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3399)
03/02/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22158)
28/03/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22145)
08/09/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28920)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 09/02/1924 16/02/1924 8 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6307
 
Gorton Works 15/09/1924 15/01/1925 123 days General  
Gorton Works 14/07/1927 18/08/1927 36 days General  
Gorton Works 08/06/1929 29/08/1929 83 days General
Boiler number 1142 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/09/1932 28/10/1932 32 days General
Boiler number 1319 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/11/1934 22/12/1934 41 days General
Boiler number 1188 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1936 29/08/1936 27 days General
Boiler number 3258 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1938 22/10/1938 64 days General
Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1940 28/09/1940 12 days General
Boiler number 1275 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 13/11/1942 24/01/1943 73 days General
Boiler number 3403 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/01/1945 17/03/1945 67 days General
Boiler number 1959 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1946 02/11/1946 61 days General
Boiler number 3238 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1948 22/01/1949 48 days General
Boiler number 3399 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63731
 
Gorton Works 04/01/1951 03/02/1951 31 days General
Boiler number 22158 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/02/1953 28/03/1953 30 days General
Boiler number 22145 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1953 01/04/1953 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 24/05/1956 08/09/1956 108 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28920 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 18/09/1956 19/09/1956 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 16/08/1960 10/09/1960 26 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 03/10/1960 08/10/1960 6 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1746
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3773
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 16/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6307
   
16/02/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
21/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
21/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
15/09/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1924. Dep: 15/01/1925.    
14/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1927. Dep: 18/08/1927.    
08/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1929. Dep: 29/08/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1142 (Diagram 15)
   
27/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1932. Dep: 28/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1319 (Diagram 15)
   
12/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1934. Dep: 22/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1188 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
03/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1936. Dep: 29/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3258 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
20/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1938. Dep: 22/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15)
   
17/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1940. Dep: 28/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1275 (Diagram 15)
   
13/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1942. Dep: 24/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3403 (Diagram 15)
   
05/09/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
10/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1945. Dep: 17/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1959 (Diagram 15)
   
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3731    
03/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3238 (Diagram 15)
   
24/11/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
06/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1948. Dep: 22/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3399 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63731
   
04/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1951. Dep: 03/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22158 (Diagram 15)
   
17/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
27/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1953. Dep: 28/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22145 (Diagram 15)
   
31/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/03/1953. Dep: 01/04/1953.    
24/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1956. Dep: 08/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28920 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/09/1956. Dep: 19/09/1956.    
29/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
16/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/08/1960. Dep: 10/09/1960.    
03/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/10/1960. Dep: 08/10/1960.    
29/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63731 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev