Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 407 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 6770 Week
» 9352 Month
» 273985 Year
» 1495550 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1747 m/e 12/1919
LNER (1924) 6501   20/06/1925
LNER (1946) 3732   04/05/1946
BR 63732 w/e 12/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/312/1919
O4/828/07/1956
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E109
Works Number 3774
To Service During 12/1919
Taken into Stock 20/06/1925
Withdrawal Sun 05/09/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
Service Life 45 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Cox & Danks, Wadsley Bridge, 10/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1919
GOR Gorton 19/06/1925
WFD Woodford Halse 09/07/1925
DON Doncaster 24/09/1928
WFD Woodford Halse 26/11/1928
WHL West Hartlepool 03/09/1942
HLS Hull Springhead 12/01/1945
HLD Hull Dairycoates 11/09/1949
HLS Hull Springhead 04/12/1949
53A Hull Dairycoates 21/05/1950
40E Langwith Junction 02/09/1951
   Withdrawn 05/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC HLS Hull Springhead w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 21/05/1950
LOAN 40B Immingham 02/09/1951
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 08/09/1951
WDN   w/e 05/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1365)
20/05/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1968)
30/07/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1212)
11/08/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1160)
23/01/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1210)
17/06/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3287)
06/06/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3271)
19/08/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1005)
04/05/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 3347)
12/06/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 3218)
21/07/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 22197)
01/10/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 22177)
28/07/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28897)
15/11/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28371)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 04/04/1925 20/06/1925 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6501
 
Gorton Works 29/08/1927 08/10/1927 41 days General  
Gorton Works 28/03/1930 20/05/1930 54 days General
Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/06/1932 30/07/1932 34 days General
Boiler number 1212 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/07/1934 11/08/1934 24 days General
Boiler number 1160 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1936 23/01/1937 34 days General
Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/05/1939 17/06/1939 43 days General
Boiler number 3287 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/05/1942 06/06/1942 18 days General
Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/07/1944 19/08/1944 20 days General
Boiler number 1005 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1946 04/05/1946 47 days General
Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3732
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1948 12/06/1948 33 days General
Boiler number 3218 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63732
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1951 21/07/1951 52 days General
Boiler number 22197 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 10/09/1953 01/10/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22177 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1956 28/07/1956 76 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28897 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 22/08/1958 20/09/1958 30 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 14/10/1958 15/11/1958 33 days General
Boiler number 28371 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 23/03/1962 03/05/1962 42 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1747
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3774
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
04/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1925. Dep: 20/06/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6501
   
19/06/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
20/06/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
09/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
29/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1927. Dep: 08/10/1927.    
24/09/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
26/11/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
28/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1930. Dep: 20/05/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15)
   
27/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1932. Dep: 30/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1212 (Diagram 15)
   
19/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1934. Dep: 11/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1160 (Diagram 15)
   
21/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1936. Dep: 23/01/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 15)
   
06/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1939. Dep: 17/06/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3287 (Diagram 15)
   
20/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1942. Dep: 06/06/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 15)
   
03/09/1942 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
31/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1944. Dep: 19/08/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1005 (Diagram 15)
   
12/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
19/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3732
   
11/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1948. Dep: 12/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3218 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63732
   
11/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
04/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
31/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1951. Dep: 21/07/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22197 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
10/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1953. Dep: 01/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22177 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1956. Dep: 28/07/1956.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28897 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/08/1958. Dep: 20/09/1958.    
14/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1958. Dep: 15/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28371 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/03/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/03/1962. Dep: 03/05/1962.    
05/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63732 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev