Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1056 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7445 Week
» 27887 Month
» 364733 Year
» 1586298 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1748 m/e 04/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6502   20/06/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3733   31/03/1946
British Railways 63733 w/e 07/10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E109
Works Number 3775
To Service During 04/1920
Taken into Stock 20/06/1925
Withdrawal Thu 14/01/1960 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 39 yrs, 9 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1920
GOR Gorton on 19/06/1925
WFD Woodford Halse on 09/07/1925
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 03/02/1946
   Withdrawn on 14/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall m/e 28/02/1946
WDN   on 14/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1920 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1447)
29/10/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 820)
07/11/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1359)
01/09/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1158)
24/10/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
24/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1291)
24/10/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
30/07/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3231)
14/09/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3222)
21/08/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3343)
17/11/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3391)
22/11/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3207)
30/09/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22115)
07/02/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22132)
11/02/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22180)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 04/04/1925 20/06/1925 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6502
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1927 29/10/1927 57 days General
Boiler number 820 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1929 08/06/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 24/10/1931 07/11/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1359 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1934 01/09/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1158 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/10/1936 24/10/1936 8 days General
Boiler number 1291 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 23/07/1938 30/07/1938 8 days General
Boiler number 3231 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1940 14/09/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 3222 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 15/07/1943 21/08/1943 38 days General
Boiler number 3343 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1944 21/10/1944 24 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 27/10/1945 17/11/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 3391 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/11/1947 22/11/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 3207 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1950 30/09/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 22115 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63733
 
Gorton Works 04/10/1950 05/10/1950 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 24/01/1953 07/02/1953 15 days General
Boiler number 22132 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1953 13/02/1953 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 04/07/1953 08/08/1953 36 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1953 12/08/1953 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 07/01/1956 11/02/1956 36 days General
Boiler number 22180 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/01/1960 04/01/1960 1 day No repairs  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1943 Cambridge Area Notes (By The Cambridge University Railway Club) Interest in the Cambridge area continues to centre upon the procession of locomotives to and from Stratford works. These usually spend some time on the dead road at Cambridge shed before proceeding on their journey; luckily they are then easily visible from the public highway. Only one 'O4' has been so reported recently-6502, which passed through on 31/8, newly repainted. This seems rather a roundabout way to return to Woodford-may the practice continue!
There has been a recent tendency for 'E4's' and 'J15's' to be returned to Norwich via Cambridge; and 7791, 7497, 7516 & 7825 have been seen. Nos. 7360(LIN), 7323(NWE) and 7400(FRO) have been noted returning from Stratford-the former stayed in Cambridge for about three weeks. 7340(BSE) (Bury) has also been to Cambridge and worked in the yard for about a month, presumably on loan, as 7011 & 7190 have gone to Stratford for repair; and the stud of shunting tanks has been further depleted by the loan of 7256 to KL.
No. 2095 was in Cambridge yards on 21/9 presumably returning to Darlington. Nos. 4355, 3400, 089 an 092 have recently been in Cambridge for repairs, whilst 065 was in the yard on 18/9 and probably has gone to Stratford. Light repairs to South Lynn engines are often performed in Cambridge-usually at the back of the running shed unless the lift shop gear is required. This practice results in little check being possible on the rarest of our visitors!
Nos. 8883/7/99 have returned from Stratford rebuilt as class D16/3; 8896 returned not so rebuilt. 8899 is the first of the 8890 series to be rebuilt. 8887 has been transferred from KL to CAM on rebuilding. A number of 'D15's' can be seen still-8867(COL) is almost a daily visitor, and spent some time recently in the lift shops; 8881/90/3/5/6(KL) of King's Lynn often appear; 8892/7(BSE) of Bury appear on most days whilst 7764 is stationed at Cambridge.
The large stud of Passenger locomotives attached results in a certain dullness of workings. Duties on the Liverpool St. line are split between Cambridge and Stratford; there is one regular Colchester working via Haverhill and also one from Ipswich and King's Lynn and two from Bury. Certain other trains, especially those from March via St. Ives, are often powered from March or King's Lynn sheds. Norwich locomotives appear irregularly-most frequently 'Sandringhams,' which appear sometimes on Stratford turns.
Recently a certain amount of variety has crept into the Liverpool St. workings as 'K3's' and 'K2's' have appeared fairly frequently. On 23/8/43 Nos. 4647, 2459 an 163 appeared on successive trains. On 19/9 the first part of the 2.20 p.m. ex Liverpool St. came in behind 2816(IPS) and the second behind 4631 (NOR).
The majority of trains on the King's Cross line continue to be hauled by 'C1' Atlantics. There are three turns on which Pacifics and 'V2's' appear fairly regularly-almost invariably King's Cross locomotives. There is a certain amount of variety with the 'Atlantics'; though those from sheds North of Peterborough are very rare. Two trains are usually hauled by Cambridge locos. almost always 'B17's' or 'Clauds.' Recently 2844(NOR) worked one of these, and must have been a very rare visitor at King's Cross. The turntable at Cambridge is now under repair and, as a result, the big engines do not work in as they cannot be turned on the LMS table. Cambridge 'Claud' workings compensate for the increase in strain on the GN sheds.
March is, of course, the main source of Goods locos. and its 'O2's' and 0-6-0's are abundant. Since the arrival of the American locomotives, the 'K3's' have become less common though the K2's' the more so. On a recent afternoon there were four types of 2-8-0 in the yard-'02'; USA; 'Austerity' (one from LNE and one from LMS); and a standard LMS freight built by SR. Later one of the Vulcan-built 'Austerities' came in (the other 2 were by N.B. Loco), followed by an 'O4.'
The LNW trains, as ever, specialise in bringing us Bletchley 'Princes,' 2-6-4T and 0-8-0. There is one regular 2D turn per day. Occasionally standard 0-6-0's (usually from the Midland division) appear and also standard 2-8-0's from 1A. Recently 4-4-0 420 (2A) appeared on a passenger train; another recent visitor has been Compound No. 900. On the Midland trains, Kettering supplies a variety of 2F 0-6-0's which, together with 2-4-0 No. 20216, appear to be well suited to this type of work on local passenger trains.
SLS/194401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1920 To Service To service as ROD Number 1748
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3775
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
04/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1925. Dep: 20/06/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6502
   
19/06/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
20/06/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
09/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
03/09/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1927. Dep: 29/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 820 (Diagram 15)
   
04/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1929. Dep: 08/06/1929.    
24/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1931. Dep: 07/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1359 (Diagram 15)
   
18/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1934. Dep: 01/09/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1158 (Diagram 15)
   
17/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1936. Dep: 24/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1291 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
23/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1938. Dep: 30/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3231 (Diagram 15)
   
24/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1940. Dep: 14/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3222 (Diagram 15)
   
15/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1943. Dep: 21/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3343 (Diagram 15)
   
28/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/09/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944.    
27/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1945. Dep: 17/11/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3391 (Diagram 15)
   
03/02/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
31/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3733    
01/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1947. Dep: 22/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3207 (Diagram 15)
   
16/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1950. Dep: 30/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22115 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63733
   
04/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/10/1950. Dep: 05/10/1950.    
24/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1953. Dep: 07/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22132 (Diagram 15)
   
10/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/02/1953. Dep: 13/02/1953.    
04/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/07/1953. Dep: 08/08/1953.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
09/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/08/1953. Dep: 12/08/1953.    
07/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1956. Dep: 11/02/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22180 (Diagram 15)
   
04/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 04/01/1960. Dep: 04/01/1960.    
14/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 63733 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev