Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 533 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4271 Week
» 1784 Month
» 229668 Year
» 1451233 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1749 m/e 04/1920
LNER (1924) 6503   20/03/1926
LNER (1946) 3734   30/06/1946
BR 63734 w/e 21/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/304/1920
O4/830/06/1956
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E109
Works Number 3776
To Service During 04/1920
Taken into Stock 20/03/1926
Withdrawal Sun 08/08/1965 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping Mon 11/10/1965 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 45 yrs, 4 mths , 8 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to A Draper, Hull, 9/65. Cut up 11/10/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1920
GOR Gorton 20/03/1926
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 23/03/1926
STV Staveley (G.C.) 26/01/1932
SHF Sheffield Darnall 07/08/1949
41F Mexborough 09/09/1962
41A Sheffield Darnall 09/12/1962
41F Mexborough 20/01/1963
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 22/09/1963
36A Doncaster 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn 08/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 3w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 6w/e 05/10/1963
WDN   3w/e 04/05/1964
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 08/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1920 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1108)
07/08/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1069)
19/08/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1808)
07/12/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
07/12/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1234)
20/11/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1353)
15/06/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3401)
25/07/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3386)
25/11/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 813)
21/09/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 862)
20/08/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1025)
12/05/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22187)
21/11/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22126)
30/06/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28896)
01/03/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28387)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/01/1926 20/03/1926 58 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6503
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1928 18/09/1928 51 days General  
Gorton Works 09/06/1930 07/08/1930 60 days General
Boiler number 1069 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/07/1933 19/08/1933 34 days General
Boiler number 1808 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1935 07/12/1935 41 days General
Boiler number 1234 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1937 20/11/1937 23 days General
Chimney altered
Boiler number 1353 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/05/1940 15/06/1940 19 days General
Boiler number 3401 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1942 25/07/1942 34 days General
Boiler number 3386 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/05/1943 07/08/1943 81 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 06/11/1944 25/11/1944 20 days General
Boiler number 813 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/08/1946 21/09/1946 47 days General
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/07/1948 20/08/1948 37 days General
Boiler number 1025 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63734
 
Gorton Works 22/04/1951 12/05/1951 21 days General
Boiler number 22187 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1951 22/05/1951 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 29/10/1953 21/11/1953 24 days General
Boiler number 22126 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1956 30/06/1956 73 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28896 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 26/01/1961 01/03/1961 35 days General
Boiler number 28387 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1920 To Service To service as ROD Number 1749
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3776
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
22/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1926. Dep: 20/03/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6503
   
20/03/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
20/03/1926 To Stock To LNER stock    
23/03/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
30/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1928. Dep: 18/09/1928.    
09/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1930. Dep: 07/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1069 (Diagram 15)
   
26/01/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
17/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1933. Dep: 19/08/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1808 (Diagram 15)
   
28/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1935. Dep: 07/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1234 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
29/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1937. Dep: 20/11/1937.
Work undertaken:
Chimney altered
Boiler number 1353 (Diagram 15)
   
28/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1940. Dep: 15/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3401 (Diagram 15)
   
22/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1942. Dep: 25/07/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3386 (Diagram 15)
   
19/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/05/1943. Dep: 07/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
06/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1944. Dep: 25/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 813 (Diagram 15)
   
30/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3734    
06/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1946. Dep: 21/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15)
   
15/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1948. Dep: 20/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1025 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63734
   
07/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
22/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1951. Dep: 12/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22187 (Diagram 15)
   
16/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/05/1951. Dep: 22/05/1951.    
29/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1953. Dep: 21/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22126 (Diagram 15)
   
19/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1956. Dep: 30/06/1956.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28896 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1961. Dep: 01/03/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28387 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
09/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
20/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
22/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
08/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63734 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev