Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 772 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 772 Week
» 18108 Month
» 295904 Year
» 1180285 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 412 m/e 01/1918
LNER (1924) 5412   27/10/1925
LNER (1946) 3902   20/10/1946
BR 63902 w/e 01/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O501/1918
O4/601/07/1922
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 555
To Service During 01/1918
Withdrawal Sun 11/04/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 47 yrs, 3 mths , 11 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to J Cashmore, Great Bridge, 5/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 01/07/1922
MEX Mexborough 09/02/1924
SHF Sheffield Darnall 27/04/1947
IMM Immingham 04/10/1947
DON Doncaster 18/12/1949
40E Langwith Junction 25/06/1950
   Withdrawn 11/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall 27/04/1947
ALLOC IMM Immingham 04/10/1947
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction m/e 30/06/1950
WDN   w/e 11/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1918 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number ?)
01/07/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1171)
27/10/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1452)
02/10/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 548)
17/03/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1473)
21/11/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1381)
21/11/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
06/01/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1968)
30/01/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3256)
03/05/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3404)
23/09/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22109)
06/12/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22880)
12/02/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22223)
01/06/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22221)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 13/05/1922 01/07/1922 50 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1171 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/04/1923 25/07/1923 89 days General  
Gorton Works 08/07/1925 27/10/1925 112 days General
Boiler number 1452 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5412
 
Gorton Works 08/05/1928 03/07/1928 57 days General  
Gorton Works 02/08/1930 02/10/1930 62 days General
Boiler number 548 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/01/1934 17/03/1934 46 days General
Spring gear altered for working to Whitemoor
Boiler number 1473 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/10/1936 21/11/1936 36 days General
Boiler number 1381 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1939 06/01/1940 63 days General
Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/12/1942 30/01/1943 39 days General
Boiler number 3256 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1945 02/03/1946 76 days General  
Gorton Works 21/03/1948 03/05/1948 44 days General
Boiler number 3404 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63902
 
Gorton Works 21/08/1950 23/09/1950 34 days General
Boiler number 22109 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/09/1950 29/09/1950 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 08/10/1950 11/10/1950 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 17/11/1952 06/12/1952 20 days General
Boiler number 22880 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1954 12/02/1955 60 days General
Boiler number 22223 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/08/1955 08/09/1955 32 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 11/10/1956 10/11/1956 31 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 11/05/1957 01/06/1957 22 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22221 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/05/1958 05/07/1958 39 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 07/04/1961 12/05/1961 36 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1918 To Service To service as GCR Number 412
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15B boiler fitted
   
13/05/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1922. Dep: 01/07/1922.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1171 (Diagram 15)
   
01/07/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
28/04/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1923. Dep: 25/07/1923.    
09/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
08/07/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1925. Dep: 27/10/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1452 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5412
   
08/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1928. Dep: 03/07/1928.    
02/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1930. Dep: 02/10/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 548 (Diagram 15)
   
31/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1934. Dep: 17/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Spring gear altered for working to Whitemoor
Boiler number 1473 (Diagram 15)
   
17/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1936. Dep: 21/11/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1381 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
05/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1939. Dep: 06/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15)
   
23/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1942. Dep: 30/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3256 (Diagram 15)
   
17/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1945. Dep: 02/03/1946.    
20/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3902    
27/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
04/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
21/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1948. Dep: 03/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3404 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63902
   
18/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
21/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1950. Dep: 23/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22109 (Diagram 15)
   
27/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/09/1950. Dep: 29/09/1950.    
08/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/10/1950. Dep: 11/10/1950.    
17/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1952. Dep: 06/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22880 (Diagram 15)
   
15/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1954. Dep: 12/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22223 (Diagram 15)
   
08/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/08/1955. Dep: 08/09/1955.    
11/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/10/1956. Dep: 10/11/1956.    
11/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/05/1957. Dep: 01/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22221 (Diagram 15)
   
28/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 28/05/1958. Dep: 05/07/1958.    
07/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/04/1961. Dep: 12/05/1961.    
11/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63902 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev