|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/03/1921 | 25/07/1921 | 136 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/05/1923 | 30/07/1923 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 1790 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/08/1925 | 21/01/1926 | 153 days | General | Boiler number 1788 (Diagram 15B) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5417 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/11/1927 | 10/01/1928 | 62 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/02/1929 | 11/04/1929 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 11 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/07/1931 | 25/08/1931 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 1791 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1934 | 31/05/1934 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 13 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/01/1937 | 20/02/1937 | 35 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/6 Boiler number 1267 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 06/04/1940 | 04/05/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3395 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1943 | 17/04/1943 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 825 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/08/1945 | 29/09/1945 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 3334 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1948 | 21/02/1948 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 3403 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3906 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/06/1950 | 29/07/1950 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63906 |
||
Gorton Works | 07/08/1952 | 30/08/1952 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 22289 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1954 | 12/02/1955 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 22298 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1957 | 16/11/1957 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 22224 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1959 | 26/06/1959 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 18/04/1961 | 18/05/1961 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 22264 (Diagram 15) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/01/1965 | Doncaster MPD (Awaiting works or stored) | Awaiting works or stored: 60114/128/157/8, 62037/40/51/5, 63906, 90302/469, 92169/70/5. | SLS/196502 |
23/01/1965 | Doncaster MPD (Waiting works or stored) | Waiting works or stored: 60114/28/57/8, 61212, 62020/33/7/40/51/5/66, 63606/728/906, 90042/469, 92169/70/5/92/8/9. | SLS/196503 |
07/03/1965 | Doncaster MPD (Awaiting sale for scrap) | Awaiting sale for scrap: 62051, 63906, 90042/119, 92192. | SLS/196504 |
04/04/1965 | Doncaster Works (Stored) | Erecting shop: D1522, D1776, D2039, D2554, D2958, D3159, D3327, D3650, D3689, D4073, D5051/580/607/48, D5809/49/50/61, D6716/48; Outside: D5557/95, D5623, D6733, D8233; Stripping shop: D5588, D5632/52/4/80 also D3444, D5615, D9009 an D4066; New Erecting shop: E3111-3120, D5532, D8228, D9001; Paint shop and area: E3102/8/9/10/21/2, D3701, D5557/95, D5623/84, D6729/33, D6973/4/5, D8233; Stored: 63906, 90042/70/119/647, 92192. | SLS/196505 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1918 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 417 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15B boiler fitted |
||
20/09/1919 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
12/03/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1921. Dep: 25/07/1921. | ||
26/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1923. Dep: 30/07/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1790 (Diagram 15B) |
||
22/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1925. Dep: 21/01/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1788 (Diagram 15B) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5417 |
||
10/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1927. Dep: 10/01/1928. | ||
21/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1929. Dep: 11/04/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 11 (Diagram 15B) |
||
18/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1931. Dep: 25/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1791 (Diagram 15B) |
||
25/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1934. Dep: 31/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 13 (Diagram 15B) |
||
17/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1937. Dep: 20/02/1937. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/6 Boiler number 1267 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
06/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1940. Dep: 04/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3395 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1943. Dep: 17/04/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 825 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1945. Dep: 29/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3334 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3906 | ||
25/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1948. Dep: 21/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3403 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3906 |
||
25/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
31/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
08/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1950. Dep: 29/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63906 |
||
07/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1952. Dep: 30/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22289 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1954. Dep: 12/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22298 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1957. Dep: 16/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22224 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/06/1959. Dep: 26/06/1959. | ||
18/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1961. Dep: 18/05/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22264 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/01/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63906 from Frodingham (36C) | ||
05/04/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |