Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 103 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5324 Week
» 20438 Month
» 323628 Year
» 1545193 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 418 m/e 08/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5418   14/02/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3907   31/03/1946
British Railways 63907 w/e 19/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O508/1918
O4/630/01/1936
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 555
To Service During 08/1918
Withdrawal Fri 22/05/1964 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
Service Life 45 yrs, 9 mths , 21 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Cox & Danks, Wadsley Bridge, 8/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1918
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 05/08/1921
36D Barnsley on 18/03/1951
41F Mexborough on 03/01/1960
41J Langwith Junction on 01/03/1964
   Withdrawn on 22/05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36D Barnsley m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 07/03/1964
WDN   on 22/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1918 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1736)
14/02/1924 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1724)
25/06/1931 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1789)
30/01/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1308)
30/01/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
05/03/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1168)
06/04/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1314)
04/07/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3287)
18/11/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3389)
12/06/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1129)
23/06/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3394)
22/07/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3277)
22/11/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22878)
17/03/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22139)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 09/04/1921 03/08/1921 117 days General  
Gorton Works 24/11/1923 14/02/1924 83 days General
Boiler number 1724 (Diagram 15B)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5418
 
Gorton Works 19/07/1926 12/10/1926 86 days General  
Gorton Works 07/01/1929 07/03/1929 60 days General  
Gorton Works 30/04/1931 25/06/1931 57 days General
Boiler number 1789 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 07/07/1933 16/09/1933 72 days General  
Gorton Works 13/12/1935 30/01/1936 49 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1308 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 06/02/1938 05/03/1938 28 days General
Boiler number 1168 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1940 06/04/1940 28 days General
Boiler number 1314 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1942 04/07/1942 30 days General
Boiler number 3287 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1943 24/04/1943 79 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 23/10/1944 18/11/1944 27 days General
Boiler number 3389 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/05/1946 12/06/1946 31 days General
Boiler number 1129 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/05/1948 23/06/1948 32 days General
Boiler number 3394 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63907
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1950 22/07/1950 48 days General
Boiler number 3277 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/11/1952 22/11/1952 20 days General
Boiler number 22878 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/02/1956 17/03/1956 38 days General
Boiler number 22139 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1960 11/03/1960 36 days Heavy Intermediate  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1948 Stratford Works The following withdrawn locomotives (all marked 'Darlington') were in the fields behind the new Works: Nos. 5383, 7120/37, 7511/12; with the exception of No. 7137, the rest had gone on 3/4, presumably to Darlington. Nos. 5399, 5410/18, 7130/32 an 8213 (all withdrawn) which were formerly in the fields are now dumped on the road next to the stripping shop. Nos. 7131/35 were being cut up in the Paint Shop. The following W.D. 2-8-0's were newly painted and had been through shops recently:-Nos. 70867/874, 78580, 78605/675, 79205/233. By the type of lettering some appeared to have been dealt with in Belgium. Nos. 1530, 1639, 1766, 4773 an 9652 had been newly painted, prefixed 'E' and lettered 'British Railways,' while those noted renumbered (60000 added) were:-Nos. 1574, 7202, 9639 an 9659. SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1918 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 418
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15B boiler fitted
   
09/04/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1921. Dep: 03/08/1921.    
05/08/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
24/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1923. Dep: 14/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1724 (Diagram 15B)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5418
   
19/07/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1926. Dep: 12/10/1926.    
07/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1929. Dep: 07/03/1929.    
30/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1931. Dep: 25/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1789 (Diagram 15B)
   
07/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1933. Dep: 16/09/1933.    
13/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1935. Dep: 30/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1308 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
06/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1938. Dep: 05/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1168 (Diagram 15)
   
10/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1940. Dep: 06/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1314 (Diagram 15)
   
05/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1942. Dep: 04/07/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3287 (Diagram 15)
   
05/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/02/1943. Dep: 24/04/1943.    
23/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1944. Dep: 18/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3389 (Diagram 15)
   
31/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3907    
13/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1946. Dep: 12/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1129 (Diagram 15)
   
23/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1948. Dep: 23/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3394 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63907
   
05/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1950. Dep: 22/07/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3277 (Diagram 15)
   
18/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
03/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1952. Dep: 22/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22878 (Diagram 15)
   
09/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1956. Dep: 17/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22139 (Diagram 15)
   
03/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
05/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/02/1960. Dep: 11/03/1960.    
01/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
22/05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63907 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev