Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 1061 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7451 Week
» 36949 Month
» 373795 Year
» 1595360 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 419 m/e 09/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5419   23/10/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3908   24/11/1946
British Railways 63908 w/e 17/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O509/1918
O4/606/04/1935
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 555
To Service During 09/1918
Withdrawal Tue 01/10/1963 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Service Life 45 yrs, 1 mth , 0 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap, 1/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1918
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 24/03/1922
40E Langwith Junction on 10/09/1950
40B Immingham on 02/12/1951
38A Colwick on 20/09/1953
36B Mexborough on 29/01/1956
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 26/11/1961
   Withdrawn on 01/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN 32A Norwich Thorpe on 06/02/1950
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 10/09/1950
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 5w/e 09/12/1961
WDN   on 01/10/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1918 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1737)
16/01/1924 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1738)
15/02/1929 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 13)
19/12/1930 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1735)
10/03/1933 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1737)
06/04/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1267)
06/04/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
30/01/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1070)
20/05/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1259)
19/07/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3244)
16/01/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3422)
06/10/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1239)
31/10/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 804)
17/12/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1237)
01/03/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22248)
30/04/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22215)
01/03/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22249)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 04/06/1921 07/08/1921 65 days General  
Gorton Works 03/11/1923 16/01/1924 75 days General
Boiler number 1738 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 19/07/1926 23/10/1926 97 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5419
 
Gorton Works 08/01/1929 15/02/1929 39 days General
Boiler number 13 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 01/11/1930 19/12/1930 49 days General
Boiler number 1735 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 07/01/1931 14/02/1931 39 days General  
Gorton Works 05/01/1933 10/03/1933 65 days General
Boiler number 1737 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 28/02/1935 06/04/1935 38 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1267 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1936 30/01/1937 34 days General
Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/04/1939 20/05/1939 43 days General
Boiler number 1259 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/06/1941 19/07/1941 42 days General
Boiler number 3244 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1942 16/01/1943 34 days General
Boiler number 3422 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/08/1945 06/10/1945 55 days General
Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1947 07/07/1947 156 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 04/09/1947 31/10/1947 58 days General
Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1949 17/12/1949 28 days General
Boiler number 1237 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63908
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1949 26/12/1949 7 days General  
Gorton Works 02/02/1952 01/03/1952 29 days General
Boiler number 22248 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1952 05/03/1952 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 01/04/1954 30/04/1954 30 days General
Boiler number 22215 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1954 07/05/1954 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 10/12/1957 01/03/1958 82 days General
Boiler number 22249 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/04/1958 19/04/1958 4 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1918 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 419
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15B boiler fitted
   
04/06/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1921. Dep: 07/08/1921.    
24/03/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
03/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1923. Dep: 16/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1738 (Diagram 15B)
   
19/07/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1926. Dep: 23/10/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5419
   
08/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1929. Dep: 15/02/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 13 (Diagram 15B)
   
01/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1930. Dep: 19/12/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1735 (Diagram 15B)
   
07/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1931. Dep: 14/02/1931.    
05/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1933. Dep: 10/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1737 (Diagram 15B)
   
28/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1935. Dep: 06/04/1935.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1267 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
28/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1936. Dep: 30/01/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15)
   
08/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1259 (Diagram 15)
   
08/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1941. Dep: 19/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3244 (Diagram 15)
   
14/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1942. Dep: 16/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3422 (Diagram 15)
   
13/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15)
   
24/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3908    
02/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1947. Dep: 07/07/1947.    
04/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1947. Dep: 31/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15)
   
20/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1949. Dep: 17/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1237 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63908
   
20/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1949. Dep: 26/12/1949.    
10/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
02/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
02/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1952. Dep: 01/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22248 (Diagram 15)
   
04/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/03/1952. Dep: 05/03/1952.    
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
01/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1954. Dep: 30/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22215 (Diagram 15)
   
03/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/05/1954. Dep: 07/05/1954.    
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
10/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1957. Dep: 01/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22249 (Diagram 15)
   
16/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/04/1958. Dep: 19/04/1958.    
26/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
01/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63908 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev