Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 141 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6530 Week
» 26972 Month
» 363818 Year
» 1585383 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 420 m/e 04/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5420   21/08/1926
War Dept. 733   14/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O504/1919
O4/613/09/1941
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 555
To Service During 04/1919
Withdrawal Sun 14/09/1941 off March (MAR)
Service Life 22 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Cambridge shed 4/32: Drag box altered to obviate breaking on Whitemoor hump
Renumbered 733 and sent to the Middle East via Greenock, 9/10/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1919
GOR Gorton on 12/03/1920
MEX Mexborough on 09/02/1924
MAR March on 28/03/1932
   Withdrawn on 14/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1919 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1738)
13/10/1923 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1726)
21/08/1926 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1790)
08/06/1929 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1788)
12/12/1931 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1738)
05/10/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
05/10/1935 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 64)
22/10/1938 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1726)
13/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3439)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 03/01/1920 31/01/1920 29 days Light Repair
Adapted to burn fuel oil
 
Gorton Works 25/08/1923 13/10/1923 50 days General
Boiler number 1726 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 10/04/1926 21/08/1926 134 days General
Boiler number 1790 (Diagram 15B)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5420
 
Gorton Works 16/07/1927 03/09/1927 50 days General  
Gorton Works 18/05/1929 08/06/1929 22 days General
Boiler number 1788 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1931 12/12/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1738 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 25/02/1933 18/03/1933 22 days Light Repair
Rail washing gear fitted
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1935 05/10/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 64 (Diagram 15B)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1938 22/10/1938 22 days General
Number still on tender when entering works
Boiler number 1726 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 01/09/1941 13/09/1941 13 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 3439 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1919 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 420
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15B boiler fitted
   
03/01/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/01/1920. Dep: 31/01/1920.
Work undertaken:
Adapted to burn fuel oil
   
12/03/1920 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
25/08/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1923. Dep: 13/10/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1726 (Diagram 15B)
   
09/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
10/04/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1926. Dep: 21/08/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1790 (Diagram 15B)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5420
   
16/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1927. Dep: 03/09/1927.    
18/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1929. Dep: 08/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1788 (Diagram 15B)
   
28/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1931. Dep: 12/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1738 (Diagram 15B)
   
28/03/1932 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
25/02/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/02/1933. Dep: 18/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Rail washing gear fitted
   
14/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1935. Dep: 05/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 64 (Diagram 15B)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
01/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1938. Dep: 22/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Number still on tender when entering works
Boiler number 1726 (Diagram 15B)
   
01/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 3439 (Diagram 15)
   
14/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 733 from March (MAR)    
14/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 733    

prev prev