Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 148 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6537 Week
» 26979 Month
» 363825 Year
» 1585390 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 421 m/e 07/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5421   01/11/1924
War Dept. 781   11/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O507/1919
O4/611/10/1941
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 555
To Service During 07/1919
Withdrawal Sat 11/10/1941 off March (MAR)
Service Life 22 yrs, 3 mths , 11 dys

Notes
Notes Cambridge shed 4/32: Drag box altered to obviate breaking on Whitemoor hump
Renumbered 781 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1919
MEX Mexborough on 20/09/1919
MAR March on 01/04/1932
   Withdrawn on 11/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1919 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1788)
01/11/1924 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1736)
03/12/1927 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1734)
31/10/1931 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1)
19/10/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
19/10/1935 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1738)
01/10/1938 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 58)
11/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3421)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/10/1920 11/12/1920 57 days General  
Gorton Works 09/12/1922 17/02/1923 71 days General  
Gorton Works 06/09/1924 01/11/1924 57 days General
Boiler number 1736 (Diagram 15B)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5421
 
Gorton Works 25/04/1925 09/05/1925 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 29/10/1927 03/12/1927 36 days General
Boiler number 1734 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1929 30/03/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 10/10/1931 31/10/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 20/05/1933 27/05/1933 8 days Light Repair
Rail washing gear fitted
 
Gorton Works 05/10/1935 19/10/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1738 (Diagram 15B)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1938 01/10/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 58 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1941 11/10/1941 19 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 3421 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 781
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1919 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 421
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15B boiler fitted
   
20/09/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
16/10/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1920. Dep: 11/12/1920.    
09/12/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1922. Dep: 17/02/1923.    
06/09/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1924. Dep: 01/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1736 (Diagram 15B)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5421
   
25/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/04/1925. Dep: 09/05/1925.    
29/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1927. Dep: 03/12/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1734 (Diagram 15B)
   
23/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1929. Dep: 30/03/1929.    
10/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1931. Dep: 31/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1 (Diagram 15B)
   
01/04/1932 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
20/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/05/1933. Dep: 27/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Rail washing gear fitted
   
05/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1935. Dep: 19/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1738 (Diagram 15B)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
03/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1938. Dep: 01/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 58 (Diagram 15B)
   
23/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1941. Dep: 11/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 3421 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 781
   
11/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 781 from March (MAR)    

prev prev