Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 98 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5735 Week
» 18839 Month
» 18839 Year
» 1240404 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 10 m/e 08/1919
LNER (1924) 5010   28/02/1925
LNER (1946) 3912   26/05/1946
BR 63912 w/e 05/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O508/1919
O4/626/07/1941
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 622
To Service During 08/1919
Withdrawal Sun 09/12/1962 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 43 yrs, 4 mths , 8 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to J Cashmore, Great Bridge, 5/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 17/10/1919
CLK Colwick 18/09/1944
STV Staveley (G.C.) 30/09/1944
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
39A Gorton 26/11/1950
38A Colwick 04/05/1952
39B Sheffield Darnall 18/07/1954
40D Tuxford 09/01/1955
41J Langwith Junction 01/02/1959
   Withdrawn 09/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 14/08/1954
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   09/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1919 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1789)
28/02/1925 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 5)
05/11/1927 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1739)
02/11/1929 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1792)
21/02/1931 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 13)
16/09/1933 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1736)
13/06/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
13/06/1936 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1)
05/11/1938 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 64)
26/07/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3325)
18/12/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1023)
12/10/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3274)
05/03/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3413)
21/04/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22178)
15/08/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22137)
24/03/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22893)
06/06/1959 Water Treatment apparatus fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/01/1921 05/03/1921 43 days General  
Gorton Works 10/02/1923 14/04/1923 64 days General  
Gorton Works 17/01/1925 28/02/1925 43 days General
Boiler number 5 (Diagram 15B)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5010
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1927 05/11/1927 36 days General
Boiler number 1739 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 12/10/1929 02/11/1929 22 days General
Boiler number 1792 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 31/01/1931 21/02/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 13 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 16/08/1933 16/09/1933 32 days General
Boiler number 1736 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 23/05/1936 13/06/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 1 (Diagram 15B)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1938 05/11/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 64 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 14/07/1941 26/07/1941 13 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 3325 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/12/1943 18/12/1943 15 days General
Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1946 12/10/1946 29 days General
Boiler number 3274 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/02/1949 05/03/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 3413 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63912
 
Gorton Works 07/04/1951 21/04/1951 15 days General
Boiler number 22178 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/04/1951 27/04/1951 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 29/11/1952 10/01/1953 43 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Gorton Works 01/08/1953 15/08/1953 15 days General
Boiler number 22137 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1953 25/08/1953 8 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 25/02/1956 24/03/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 22893 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/05/1959 06/06/1959 29 days General
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1919 To Service To service as GCR Number 10
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15B boiler fitted
   
17/10/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
22/01/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1921. Dep: 05/03/1921.    
10/02/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1923. Dep: 14/04/1923.    
17/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1925. Dep: 28/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5 (Diagram 15B)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5010
   
01/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1927. Dep: 05/11/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1739 (Diagram 15B)
   
12/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1929. Dep: 02/11/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1792 (Diagram 15B)
   
31/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1931. Dep: 21/02/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 13 (Diagram 15B)
   
16/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1933. Dep: 16/09/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1736 (Diagram 15B)
   
23/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1936. Dep: 13/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1 (Diagram 15B)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
08/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1938. Dep: 05/11/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 64 (Diagram 15B)
   
14/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1941. Dep: 26/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 3325 (Diagram 15)
   
04/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1943. Dep: 18/12/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15)
   
18/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
30/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
26/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3912    
14/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1946. Dep: 12/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3274 (Diagram 15)
   
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
19/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1949. Dep: 05/03/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3413 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63912
   
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
07/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1951. Dep: 21/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22178 (Diagram 15)
   
23/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/04/1951. Dep: 27/04/1951.    
04/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
29/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/11/1952. Dep: 10/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
01/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1953. Dep: 15/08/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22137 (Diagram 15)
   
18/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/08/1953. Dep: 25/08/1953.    
18/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
09/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
25/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1956. Dep: 24/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22893 (Diagram 15)
   
01/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
09/05/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1959. Dep: 06/06/1959.
Work undertaken:
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
   
09/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63912 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev