Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 114 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1039 Week
» 18375 Month
» 296171 Year
» 1180552 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 11 m/e 08/1919
LNER (1924) 5011   21/11/1924
LNER (1946) 3913   11/08/1946
BR (Tmp) E3913   18/02/1948
BR 63913   28/10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O508/1919
O4/601/05/1936
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 622
To Service During 08/1919
Withdrawal Sun 06/06/1965 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
Service Life 45 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Cox & Danks, Wadsley Bridge, 7/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 15/11/1919
LNG Langwith Junction 07/06/1937
BRN Barnsley 21/06/1939
MAR March 02/11/1941
CAM Cambridge 22/12/1947
MEX Mexborough 22/05/1949
BRN Barnsley 21/08/1949
41F Mexborough 03/01/1960
41H Staveley (G.C.) 11/02/1962
   Withdrawn 06/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 27/12/1947
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 5w/e 10/03/1962
WDN   w/e 06/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1919 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1790)
13/07/1923 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 5)
21/11/1924 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1737)
15/10/1927 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1726)
09/10/1931 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 11)
01/05/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1081)
01/05/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
16/07/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 943)
15/03/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3245)
23/10/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1281)
06/10/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3404)
18/02/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3424)
28/10/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22122)
12/09/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22178)
29/12/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22233)
26/08/1961 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22228)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 29/01/1921 09/04/1921 71 days General  
Gorton Works 05/05/1923 13/07/1923 70 days General
Boiler number 5 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 19/09/1924 21/11/1924 64 days General
Boiler number 1737 (Diagram 15B)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5011
 
Gorton Works 19/08/1927 15/10/1927 58 days General
Boiler number 1726 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 25/01/1929 12/03/1929 47 days General  
Gorton Works 28/08/1931 09/10/1931 43 days General
Boiler number 11 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 26/04/1933 29/07/1933 95 days General  
Gorton Works 22/03/1936 01/05/1936 41 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1081 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 24/05/1938 16/07/1938 54 days General
Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/02/1941 15/03/1941 17 days General
Boiler number 3245 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/09/1943 23/10/1943 27 days General
Boiler number 1281 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/07/1945 06/10/1945 76 days General
Boiler number 3404 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1947 18/02/1948 50 days General
Boiler number 3424 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3913
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1948 03/03/1948 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 03/10/1950 28/10/1950 26 days General
Boiler number 22122 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63913
 
Gorton Works 01/11/1950 03/11/1950 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 20/08/1953 12/09/1953 24 days General
Boiler number 22178 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/11/1956 29/12/1956 48 days General
Boiler number 22233 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1961 26/08/1961 68 days General
Boiler number 22228 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/09/1961 09/09/1961 9 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1919 To Service To service as GCR Number 11
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15B boiler fitted
   
15/11/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
29/01/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1921. Dep: 09/04/1921.    
05/05/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1923. Dep: 13/07/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5 (Diagram 15B)
   
19/09/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1924. Dep: 21/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1737 (Diagram 15B)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5011
   
19/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1927. Dep: 15/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1726 (Diagram 15B)
   
25/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1929. Dep: 12/03/1929.    
28/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1931. Dep: 09/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 11 (Diagram 15B)
   
26/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1933. Dep: 29/07/1933.    
22/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1936. Dep: 01/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1081 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
07/06/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
24/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1938. Dep: 16/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15)
   
21/06/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
27/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1941. Dep: 15/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3245 (Diagram 15)
   
02/11/1941 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
27/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1943. Dep: 23/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1281 (Diagram 15)
   
23/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3404 (Diagram 15)
   
11/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3913    
22/12/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
31/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1947. Dep: 18/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3424 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3913
   
01/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/03/1948. Dep: 03/03/1948.    
22/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
21/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
03/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1950. Dep: 28/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22122 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63913
   
01/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/11/1950. Dep: 03/11/1950.    
20/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1953. Dep: 12/09/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22178 (Diagram 15)
   
12/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1956. Dep: 29/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22233 (Diagram 15)
   
03/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
20/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1961. Dep: 26/08/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22228 (Diagram 15)
   
01/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/09/1961. Dep: 09/09/1961.    
11/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
06/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63913 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev