Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 774 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 774 Week
» 18110 Month
» 295906 Year
» 1180287 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 13 m/e 10/1919
LNER (1924) 5013   14/11/1925
LNER (1946) 3915   21/08/1946
BR 63915 w/e 01/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O510/1919
O4/601/06/1940
O4/807/01/1956
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 622
To Service During 10/1919
Withdrawal Fri 23/06/1961 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 41 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 24/6/61

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 17/01/1920
DON Doncaster 18/08/1946
39A Gorton 21/05/1950
39A Gorton 3w/e 31/05/1950
40B Immingham 17/08/1952
40E Langwith Junction 20/09/1953
39A Gorton 08/01/1956
   Withdrawn 23/06/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 21/05/1950
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 28/01/1956
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 24/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1919 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1792)
06/04/1929 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1)
03/10/1931 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 58)
03/11/1934 Intensifore lubricator removed
26/06/1937 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1791)
01/06/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3229)
12/06/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3350)
12/01/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3313)
01/05/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3204)
18/08/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22208)
19/09/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22210)
07/01/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28887)
22/11/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28359)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 09/04/1921 28/05/1921 50 days General  
Gorton Works 12/05/1923 25/08/1923 106 days General  
Gorton Works 14/03/1925 14/11/1925 246 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5013
 
Gorton Works 25/02/1928 07/04/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 16/03/1929 06/04/1929 22 days General
Boiler number 1 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 19/09/1931 03/10/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 58 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1934 03/11/1934 22 days General
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 19/06/1937 26/06/1937 8 days General
Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 1791 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1940 01/06/1940 15 days General
Rebuilt to class 04/6
Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/05/1943 12/06/1943 29 days General
Boiler number 3350 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/12/1945 12/01/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3313 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/04/1948 01/05/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3204 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63915
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1950 04/03/1950 15 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 04/08/1951 18/08/1951 15 days General
Boiler number 22208 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/08/1951 24/08/1951 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 29/08/1953 19/09/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22210 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/11/1953 07/11/1953 1 day Unclassified  
Gorton Works 22/10/1955 07/01/1956 78 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28887 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 25/10/1958 22/11/1958 29 days General
Boiler number 28359 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1919 To Service To service as GCR Number 13
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15B boiler fitted
   
17/01/1920 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
09/04/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1921. Dep: 28/05/1921.    
12/05/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1923. Dep: 25/08/1923.    
14/03/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1925. Dep: 14/11/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5013
   
25/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1928. Dep: 07/04/1928.    
16/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1929. Dep: 06/04/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1 (Diagram 15B)
   
19/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1931. Dep: 03/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 58 (Diagram 15B)
   
13/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1934. Dep: 03/11/1934.
Work undertaken:
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
19/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1937. Dep: 26/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 1791 (Diagram 15B)
   
18/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1940. Dep: 01/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class 04/6
Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 15)
   
15/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1943. Dep: 12/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3350 (Diagram 15)
   
22/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1945. Dep: 12/01/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3313 (Diagram 15)
   
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
21/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3915    
10/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1948. Dep: 01/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3204 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63915
   
18/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/02/1950. Dep: 04/03/1950.    
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
04/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1951. Dep: 18/08/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22208 (Diagram 15)
   
21/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/08/1951. Dep: 24/08/1951.    
17/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
29/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1953. Dep: 19/09/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22210 (Diagram 15)
   
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
07/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/11/1953. Dep: 07/11/1953.    
22/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1955. Dep: 07/01/1956.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28887 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
25/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1958. Dep: 22/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28359 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/06/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 63915 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev