Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 166 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4334 Week
» 19448 Month
» 322638 Year
» 1544203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 14 m/e 11/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5014   18/07/1925
War Dept. 787   25/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O511/1920
O4/621/01/1933
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 622
To Service During 11/1920
Withdrawal Sat 25/10/1941 off Mexborough (MEX)
Service Life 20 yrs, 11 mths , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 787 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1920
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 11/02/1921
MEX Mexborough on 22/03/1924
   Withdrawn on 25/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1920 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1)
09/06/1923 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 13)
23/06/1928 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 873)
21/01/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1187)
02/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1077)
02/11/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
10/12/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1085)
25/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3357)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 07/04/1923 09/06/1923 64 days General
Boiler number 13 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1925 18/07/1925 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5014
 
Gorton Works 19/05/1928 23/06/1928 36 days General
Boiler number 873 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1930 31/05/1930 43 days General  
Gorton Works 24/12/1932 21/01/1933 29 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1187 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/10/1935 02/11/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1077 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1938 10/12/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 1085 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1941 25/10/1941 27 days General
Boiler number 3357 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 787
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1920 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 14
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15B boiler fitted
   
11/02/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
07/04/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1923. Dep: 09/06/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 13 (Diagram 15B)
   
22/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
16/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1925. Dep: 18/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5014
   
19/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1928. Dep: 23/06/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 873 (Diagram 15B)
   
19/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1930. Dep: 31/05/1930.    
24/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1932. Dep: 21/01/1933.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1187 (Diagram 15)
   
19/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1935. Dep: 02/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1077 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
26/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1938. Dep: 10/12/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1085 (Diagram 15)
   
29/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1941. Dep: 25/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3357 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 787
   
25/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 787 from Mexborough (MEX)    

prev prev