Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 5 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5349 Week
» 6239 Month
» 314220 Year
» 1198601 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 15 m/e 12/1920
LNER (1924) 5015   29/08/1925
LNER (1946) 3917   18/08/1946
BR 63917 w/e 08/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O512/1920
O4/629/06/1935
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 622
To Service During 12/1920
Withdrawal Tue 05/06/1962 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 41 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 03/03/1924
SHF Sheffield Darnall 27/04/1947
IMM Immingham 04/10/1947
FRO Frodingham 10/12/1949
   Withdrawn 05/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall 27/04/1947
ALLOC IMM Immingham 04/10/1947
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 24/12/1949
WDN   05/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1920 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 2)
23/06/1923 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1)
15/09/1928 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1719)
15/02/1930 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1790)
30/07/1932 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1726)
29/06/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
29/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1968)
24/04/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1271)
08/06/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1118)
08/05/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 815)
16/02/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3253)
08/05/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3209)
09/09/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22103)
13/09/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22294)
29/01/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22253)
15/06/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22261)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 21/04/1923 23/06/1923 64 days General
Boiler number 1 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 04/07/1925 29/08/1925 57 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5015
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1928 15/09/1928 43 days General
Boiler number 1719 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 25/01/1930 15/02/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1790 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 09/07/1932 30/07/1932 22 days General
Boiler number 1726 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 08/06/1935 29/06/1935 22 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 03/04/1937 24/04/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1940 08/06/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/04/1943 08/05/1943 22 days General
Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/01/1946 16/02/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3253 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/04/1948 08/05/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3209 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63917
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1950 09/09/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 22103 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/09/1950 25/09/1950 13 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 30/08/1952 13/09/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 22294 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/12/1954 29/01/1955 43 days General
Boiler number 22253 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1957 15/06/1957 29 days General
Boiler number 22261 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/06/1957 19/06/1957 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 11/05/1960 24/06/1960 45 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 01/07/1960 09/07/1960 9 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 01/06/1962 01/06/1962 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1920 To Service To service as GCR Number 15
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15B boiler fitted
   
21/04/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1923. Dep: 23/06/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1 (Diagram 15B)
   
03/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
04/07/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1925. Dep: 29/08/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5015
   
04/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1928. Dep: 15/09/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1719 (Diagram 15B)
   
25/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1930. Dep: 15/02/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1790 (Diagram 15B)
   
09/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1932. Dep: 30/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1726 (Diagram 15B)
   
08/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1935. Dep: 29/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
03/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1937. Dep: 24/04/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 15)
   
01/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15)
   
17/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1943. Dep: 08/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15)
   
26/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1946. Dep: 16/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3253 (Diagram 15)
   
18/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3917    
27/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
04/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
17/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1948. Dep: 08/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3209 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63917
   
10/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
26/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1950. Dep: 09/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22103 (Diagram 15)
   
13/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/09/1950. Dep: 25/09/1950.    
30/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1952. Dep: 13/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22294 (Diagram 15)
   
18/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1954. Dep: 29/01/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22253 (Diagram 15)
   
18/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1957. Dep: 15/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22261 (Diagram 15)
   
18/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/06/1957. Dep: 19/06/1957.    
11/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/05/1960. Dep: 24/06/1960.    
01/07/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/07/1960. Dep: 09/07/1960.    
01/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 01/06/1962. Dep: 01/06/1962.    
05/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63917 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev