Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 45 Today
» 1000 Yesterday
» 1970 Week
» 19306 Month
» 297102 Year
» 1181483 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 17 m/e 12/1920
LNER (1924) 5017   26/12/1925
War Dept. 766   18/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O512/1920
O4/629/10/1932
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 622
To Service During 12/1920
Withdrawal Sat 18/10/1941 off Mexborough (MEX)
Service Life 20 yrs, 10 mths , 18 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 766 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 04/03/1921
MEX Mexborough 03/03/1924
   Withdrawn 18/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1920 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 5)
07/07/1923 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 2)
18/08/1928 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 5)
29/10/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1221)
09/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3217)
09/11/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
03/12/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3357)
18/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1961)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 28/04/1923 07/07/1923 71 days General
Boiler number 2 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 07/11/1925 26/12/1925 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5017
 
Gorton Works 28/07/1928 18/08/1928 22 days General
Boiler number 5 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 15/03/1930 12/04/1930 29 days General  
Gorton Works 15/10/1932 29/10/1932 15 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1221 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1935 09/11/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 3217 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 19/11/1938 03/12/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 3357 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1941 18/10/1941 20 days General
Boiler number 1961 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 766
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1920 To Service To service as GCR Number 17
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15B boiler fitted
   
04/03/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
28/04/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1923. Dep: 07/07/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2 (Diagram 15B)
   
03/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
07/11/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1925. Dep: 26/12/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5017
   
28/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1928. Dep: 18/08/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5 (Diagram 15B)
   
15/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1930. Dep: 12/04/1930.    
15/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1932. Dep: 29/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1221 (Diagram 15)
   
26/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1935. Dep: 09/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3217 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
19/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1938. Dep: 03/12/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3357 (Diagram 15)
   
29/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1941. Dep: 18/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1961 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 766
   
18/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 766 from Mexborough (MEX)    

prev prev