Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 208 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 6415 Week
» 3928 Month
» 231812 Year
» 1453377 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1210 m/e 04/1905
LNER (1924) 8210 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5560 m/e 08/1946
BR 65560 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J17
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number G58
To Service During 04/1905
Withdrawal Tue 05/06/1962
Service Life 57 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1905
IPS Ipswich 01/01/1948
31C Kings Lynn w/e 02/04/1960
31A Cambridge w/e 17/09/1960
31B March w/e 22/07/1961
   Withdrawn 05/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 16/04/1960
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 01/10/1960
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 05/08/1961
WDN   05/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1905 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1210
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8210    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5560    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65560    
02/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
22/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
05/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65560    

prev prev