Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 625 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3311 Week
» 4201 Month
» 312182 Year
» 1196563 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1211 m/e 04/1905
LNER (1924) 8211 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5561 m/e 08/1946
BR 65561 w/e 09/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J17
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number G58
To Service During 04/1905
Withdrawal Mon 07/12/1959
Service Life 54 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SL South Lynn 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 18/10/1952
31A Cambridge 5w/e 17/01/1953
32B Ipswich 5w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn 07/12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1905 To Service To service as GER Number 1211
Built at Stratford Works
   
01/1917 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8211    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5561    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - South Lynn (SL)    
12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65561    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
17/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 65561    

prev prev