Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 198 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2537 Week
» 8671 Month
» 236555 Year
» 1458120 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1213 m/e 05/1905
LNER (1924) 8213 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5563 on 17/03/1946
BR 65563 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J17
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number G58
To Service During 05/1905
Withdrawal Fri 01/01/1960
Service Life 54 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1905
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948
30A Stratford 4w/e 19/01/1952
   Withdrawn 01/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 21/05/1947
ALLOC YB Yarmouth Beach w/e 18/10/1947
WDN YB Yarmouth Beach 06/02/1948
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 26/01/1952
WDN   01/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803
31/03/1948 Stratford Works The following withdrawn locomotives (all marked 'Darlington') were in the fields behind the new Works: Nos. 5383, 7120/37, 7511/12; with the exception of No. 7137, the rest had gone on 3/4, presumably to Darlington. Nos. 5399, 5410/18, 7130/32 an 8213 (all withdrawn) which were formerly in the fields are now dumped on the road next to the stripping shop. Nos. 7131/35 were being cut up in the Paint Shop. The following W.D. 2-8-0's were newly painted and had been through shops recently:-Nos. 70867/874, 78580, 78605/675, 79205/233. By the type of lettering some appeared to have been dealt with in Belgium. Nos. 1530, 1639, 1766, 4773 an 9652 had been newly painted, prefixed 'E' and lettered 'British Railways,' while those noted renumbered (60000 added) were:-Nos. 1574, 7202, 9639 an 9659. SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1905 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1213
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8213    
17/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5563    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65563    
19/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
01/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 65563    

prev prev