Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 111 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 111 Week
» 7295 Month
» 315276 Year
» 1199657 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1213 m/e 05/1905
LNER (1924) 8213 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5563 y/e 17/03/1946
BR 65563 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J17
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number G58
To Service During 05/1905
Withdrawal Fri 01/01/1960
Service Life 54 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30A Stratford 4w/e 19/01/1952
   Withdrawn 01/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1905 To Service To service as GER Number 1213
Built at Stratford Works
   
07/1916 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8213    
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5563    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65563    
19/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 65563    

prev prev