Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1300 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14706 Week
» 67722 Month
» 187249 Year
» 3214102 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1214 |
m/e |
05/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8214 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5564 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
65564 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J17 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G58 |
To Service |
During 05/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 17/08/1960 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1905 |
COL |
|
Colchester |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
30A |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/08/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/12/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/08/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1214 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8214 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5564 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65564 |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
17/08/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65564 |
|
|