Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 223 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7683 Week
» 5196 Month
» 233080 Year
» 1454645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1215 m/e 05/1905
LNER (1924) 8215 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5565 m/e 08/1946
BR 65565 m/e 09/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J17
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number G58
To Service During 05/1905
Withdrawal Tue 05/04/1960
Service Life 54 yrs, 11 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1905
SL South Lynn 01/01/1948
31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 20/10/1951
31A Cambridge 5w/e 16/02/1952
31C Kings Lynn w/e 06/12/1958
   Withdrawn 05/04/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YB Yarmouth Beach w/e 05/06/1948
WDN YB Yarmouth Beach 09/05/1949
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 18/06/1949
ALLOC 31E Bury St Edmunds w/e 13/10/1951
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 27/12/1958
WDN   05/04/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works (Paint Shop) The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1905 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1215
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8215    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5565    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - South Lynn (SL)    
09/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 65565    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
06/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
05/04/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 65565    

prev prev