Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1452 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19255 Week
» 72271 Month
» 191798 Year
» 3218651 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1216 |
m/e |
05/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8216 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5566 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
65566 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J17 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G58 |
To Service |
During 05/1905 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 04/07/1960 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys |
Information |
Vacuum Ejector and Steam Heat connector fitted in order to allow passenger work on the M&GN |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1216 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8216 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5566 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Melton Constable (MC) |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (YB) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65566 |
|
|
14/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
05/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F) |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) |
|
|
18/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
04/07/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65566 |
|
|