Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 201 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2540 Week
» 8674 Month
» 236558 Year
» 1458123 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1220 m/e 01/1906
LNER (1924) 8220 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5570 m/e 08/1946
BR 65570 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J17
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number S59
To Service During 01/1906
Withdrawal Fri 22/04/1960
Service Life 54 yrs, 3 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1906
NOR Norwich Thorpe 01/01/1948
32C Lowestoft 4w/e 21/10/1950
32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 24/03/1951
   Withdrawn 22/04/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MEL   31/08/1947
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 15/11/1947
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 18/02/1951
WDN   22/04/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1906 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1220
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8220    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5570    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65570    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
22/04/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 65570    

prev prev