Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1567 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19370 Week
» 72386 Month
» 191913 Year
» 3218766 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1220 |
m/e |
01/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8220 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5570 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
65570 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J17 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S59 |
To Service |
During 01/1906 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 22/04/1960 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 3 mths , 22 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MEL |
|
on |
31/08/1947 |
ALLOC |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
w/e |
15/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
32C |
Lowestoft |
w/e |
08/10/1950 |
ALLOC |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
w/e |
18/02/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/04/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1220 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8220 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5570 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65570 |
|
|
08/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
18/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
22/04/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65570 |
|
|