Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2562 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15968 Week
» 68984 Month
» 188511 Year
» 3215364 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1223 |
m/e |
01/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8223 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5573 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
65573 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J17 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S59 |
To Service |
During 01/1906 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 08/10/1958 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 9 mths , 7 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
w/e |
06/10/1951 |
ALLOC |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
08/10/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1223 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8223 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5573 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65573 |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
08/10/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65573 |
|
|