Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 652 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18455 Week
» 71471 Month
» 190998 Year
» 3217851 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1226 |
m/e |
02/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8226 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5576 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
65576 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J17 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S59 |
To Service |
During 02/1906 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1906 |
MAR |
|
March |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
31A |
|
Cambridge |
w/e |
28/04/1962 |
31B |
|
March |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
28/04/1962 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
2w/e |
23/06/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
07/07/1962 |
March MPD |
J17 65576 is stored at March whilst 65582 is employed as March shed pilot or on Benwick branch goods. |
SLS/196208 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1226 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8226 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5576 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65576 |
|
|
28/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65576 |
|
|