Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2255 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20058 Week
» 73074 Month
» 192601 Year
» 3219454 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1228 |
m/e |
03/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8228 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5578 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
65578 |
m/e |
03/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J17 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S59 |
To Service |
During 03/1906 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 05/03/1962 |
Service Life |
56 yrs , 4 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
on |
02/05/1947 |
ALLOC |
32B |
Ipswich |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
26/12/1959 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
05/08/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/03/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1228 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8228 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5578 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
28/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
03/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65578 |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
22/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
05/03/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65578 |
|
|