Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 143 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 143 Week
» 6277 Month
» 234161 Year
» 1455726 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1230 m/e 10/1910
LNER (1924) 8230 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5580 m/e 07/1946
BR 65580 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J17
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number T67
To Service During 10/1910
Withdrawal Mon 16/11/1959
Service Life 49 yrs, 1 mth , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1910
KL Kings Lynn 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge 4w/e 20/01/1951
32B Ipswich 4w/e 20/10/1951
31B March 5w/e 16/02/1952
31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 24/10/1953
31A Cambridge 4w/e 20/02/1954
   Withdrawn 16/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SL South Lynn 4w/e 22/01/1949
ALLOC 31A Cambridge m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 32B Ipswich w/e 20/10/1951
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 20/02/1954
WDN   16/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1910 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1230
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8230    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5580    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kings Lynn (KL)    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65580    
20/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
20/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
16/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 65580    

prev prev