Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 131 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4946 Week
» 11080 Month
» 238964 Year
» 1460529 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1232 m/e 11/1910
LNER (1924) 8232 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5582 m/e 09/1946
BR 65582 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J17
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number T67
To Service During 11/1910
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Service Life 51 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1910
SL South Lynn 01/01/1948
31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 20/10/1951
31A Cambridge w/e 17/09/1960
31B March w/e 22/07/1961
31A Cambridge w/e 02/12/1961
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn w/e 06/10/1951
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 01/10/1960
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 5w/e 09/12/1961
ALLOC 31B March 2w/e 23/06/1962
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/07/1962 March MPD J17 65576 is stored at March whilst 65582 is employed as March shed pilot or on Benwick branch goods. SLS/196208

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1910 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1232
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8232    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5582    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - South Lynn (SL)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65582    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
22/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65582    

prev prev