Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 281 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4019 Week
» 1532 Month
» 229416 Year
» 1450981 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1233 m/e 11/1910
LNER (1924) 8233 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5583 m/e 08/1946
BR 65583 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J17
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number T67
To Service During 11/1910
Withdrawal Sun 11/02/1962
Service Life 51 yrs, 3 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1910
MAR March 01/01/1948
31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 24/10/1953
31B March 4w/e 20/02/1954
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 16/09/1961
   Withdrawn 11/02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SL South Lynn 4w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC MAR March w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 20/02/1954
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   11/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1910 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1233
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8233    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5583    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65583    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
20/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
11/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65583    

prev prev