Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 284 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2623 Week
» 8757 Month
» 236641 Year
» 1458206 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1234 m/e 11/1910
LNER (1924) 8234 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5584 m/e 05/1946
BR 65584 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J17
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number T67
To Service During 11/1910
Withdrawal Tue 02/02/1960
Service Life 49 yrs, 3 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1910
MAR March 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge 4w/e 17/05/1952
31B March 4w/e 15/11/1952
31D South Lynn 3w/e 12/11/1955
31B March 5w/e 15/11/1958
31C Kings Lynn w/e 21/11/1959
   Withdrawn 02/02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 31D South Lynn 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   02/02/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1910 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1234
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8234    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5584    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65584    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
12/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to South Lynn (31D)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
21/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
02/02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 65584    

prev prev