Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 428 Today
» 961 Yesterday
» 5385 Week
» 12569 Month
» 320550 Year
» 1204931 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1235 m/e 11/1910
LNER (1924) 8235 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5585 m/e 05/1946
BR 65585 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J17
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number T67
To Service During 11/1910
Withdrawal w/e Mon 01/11/1954
Service Life 44 yrs , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 21/06/1952
31A Cambridge 4w/e 24/10/1953
   Withdrawn w/e 01/11/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1910 To Service To service as GER Number 1235
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8235    
07/1927 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5585    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65585    
21/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
01/11/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 65585    

prev prev