Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 281 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7741 Week
» 5254 Month
» 233138 Year
» 1454703 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1238 m/e 01/1911
LNER (1924) 8238 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5588 m/e 08/1946
BR 65588 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J17
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number T67
To Service During 01/1911
Withdrawal Mon 29/05/1961
Service Life 50 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys
Information Vacuum Ejector and Steam Heat connector fitted in order to allow passenger work on the M&GN

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1911
SL South Lynn 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge 4w/e 20/01/1951
33A Plaistow 4w/e 22/03/1952
32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 18/06/1955
32G Melton Constable 4w/e 16/03/1957
32C Lowestoft 5w/e 15/11/1958
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 18/06/1960
   Withdrawn 29/05/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31A Cambridge m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 18/06/1955
ALLOC 32G Melton Constable 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 3w/e 02/07/1960
WDN   29/05/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/11/1960 G.E. Dieselisation Extensive dieselisation has taken place on the GE and a considerable re-shuffle of diesels between March, Ipswich and Stratford took place on 21st November. Cambridge has lost all its passenger turns (steam) and its entire allocation of Bls (61046/8/66/71/82, 61236/52/3/4/80/3) has been transferred to March and Norwich, leaving 16 steam engines allocated. South Lynn is now a sub-shed of March, its allocation being 43089/90, 65548/77 an 68499. Lowestoft has lost its 3 steam engines (65462, 65588 and 68642) to store at Trowse and is completely diesel, i.e. D2039, D2553/5/68/70/3. SLS/196101

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1911 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1238
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8238    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5588    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - South Lynn (SL)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65588    
20/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
18/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
29/05/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 65588    

prev prev