|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 15/08/1925 | 22/08/1925 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1927 | 23/03/1927 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/06/1928 | 01/09/1928 | 69 days | General | Dry sand to leading wheels |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/07/1929 | 24/07/1929 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/08/1931 | 24/10/1931 | 81 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1932 | 04/04/1932 | 29 days | Light Repair | Repairs to booster |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/03/1934 | 12/05/1934 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 7699 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1935 | 29/08/1935 | 39 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1935 | 03/03/1936 | 134 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1937 | 20/02/1937 | 44 days | General | Booster cylinders from 4419 |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/05/1937 | 04/06/1937 | 9 days | Light Repair | Booster dismantled |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/05/1938 | 31/05/1938 | 19 days | Light Repair | Booster removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1940 | 18/05/1940 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/05/1942 | 23/05/1942 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1942 | 23/01/1943 | 43 days | General | 220lb boiler Boiler number 8251 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/07/1943 | 24/07/1943 | 15 days | Light Repair |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1946 | Doncaster Works | 3696 recently left Plant after its first general repair. A number of modifications have been incorporated, including the replacement of the new pattern regulator valve and hurdle by the Gresley type (it is understood that the new pattern had shown a tendency to stick), the substitution of the usual Pacific type screw reverse for the steam reverse originally fitted, and the removal of the hinged discs over the headlamps and the substitution of normal headlamp brackets. The loco now has-the eight-wheeled tender formerly attached to 4469. 4470 has also been On Plant, and has had a number of alterations made. The smoke deflectors previously mentioned have now been fitted, and the nameplates are attached to them. They are slightly sloped at the front, and turned in at the top. The cab floor of this loco was originally 6' higher than is standard on the Pacifics, but this was found to involve additional strain on the fireman. The floor has now been lowered to the usual height, and at the same time the outside of the cab and the rear portion of the running plate have been altered to the usual Pacific pattern. The external modifications to the loco have been very beneficial to its appearance. The loco has also had headlamp brackets fitted in addition to the discs. Owing to difficulties experienced with breakages of the outside exhaust pipes on the Thompson Pacifics, these pipes have now been fitted with a sliding joint. The trouble has thereby been cured. Ten O6's, 3148-57, have been turned out without Works' numbers to allow for the numbers 1554-63, which were left blank following the cancellation of a batch of J50's to which they were allotted. ln those days the Works' numbers were allotted in-advance by the Drawing Office, but they are now allotted by 'the Foreman of the New Erecting Shop to ensure that the correct sequence is maintained if two-or more orders are being executed simultaneously. It is likely that the first of the new batch of A2's will be Doncaster No. 2000. On 29/12, O6's 3156-61 were under construction. Two more conversions to A3 have been made, using the boilers off the Pl.'s. 2548 has the boiler with ordinary dome off 2393 (converted in October), whilst 2572 received the banjo-dome poiler off 2394 in November. It is Understood that conversion of the K3's to K5 is likely to be proceeded with rapidly. |
SLS/194602 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/06/1925 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2393 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1619 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
29/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
15/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/08/1925. Dep: 22/08/1925. | ||
22/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/02/1927. Dep: 23/03/1927. | ||
25/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1928. Dep: 01/09/1928. Work undertaken: Dry sand to leading wheels |
||
02/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/07/1929. Dep: 24/07/1929. | ||
05/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1931. Dep: 24/10/1931. | ||
07/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/03/1932. Dep: 04/04/1932. Work undertaken: Repairs to booster |
||
22/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1934. Dep: 12/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7699 (Diagram 94) |
||
22/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/07/1935. Dep: 29/08/1935. | ||
22/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/10/1935. Dep: 03/03/1936. | ||
08/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1937. Dep: 20/02/1937. Work undertaken: Booster cylinders from 4419 |
||
27/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/05/1937. Dep: 04/06/1937. Work undertaken: Booster dismantled |
||
13/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/05/1938. Dep: 31/05/1938. Work undertaken: Booster removed |
||
13/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1940. Dep: 18/05/1940. | ||
09/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/05/1942. Dep: 23/05/1942. | ||
12/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1942. Dep: 23/01/1943. Work undertaken: 220lb boiler Boiler number 8251 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
10/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/07/1943. Dep: 24/07/1943. | ||
24/07/1945 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2393 from New England (NWE) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 3990 but not taken up |