Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 156 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5910 Week
» 33868 Month
» 68510 Year
» 1290075 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2001   22/05/1934
LNER (1946 1st) 990   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 501   11/08/1946
BR 60501   22/05/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
22/05/1934 COCK O' THE NORTH

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class A2
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
P2/122/05/1934
P2/214/04/1938
A2/214/09/1944
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 612
Works Number 1789
To Service Mon 22/05/1934 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Mon 08/02/1960 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 25 yrs, 8 mths , 17 dys

Notes
Notes Cut-up Doncaster Works

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 22/05/1934
HAY Haymarket 31/07/1934
HAY Haymarket 21/02/1935
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 29/10/1944
64B Haymarket 04/09/1949
YK York (North) 27/11/1949
50B Neville Hill 27/11/1950
50A York (North) 17/12/1950
   Withdrawn 08/02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HAY Haymarket w/e 10/09/1949
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 50A York (North) m/e 31/12/1950
WDN   w/e 08/02/1960
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 30/07/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
22/05/1934 Diagram 106 boiler fitted (number 8771)
24/10/1952 Diagram 118 boiler fitted (number 29837)
28/09/1954 Diagram 118 boiler fitted (number 29807)
28/09/1956 Diagram 118 boiler fitted (number 29876)
23/10/1958 Diagram 118 boiler fitted (number 29807)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 24/08/1934 27/08/1934 4 days Light Repair
Tablet apparatus fitted
 
Doncaster Works 10/09/1934 17/09/1934 8 days Light Repair
New L H Piston
 
Doncaster Works 01/11/1934 24/11/1934 24 days Light Repair
Prepared for visit to Vitry
 
Doncaster Works 23/02/1935 30/03/1935 36 days Light Repair
New oil cooling arrgangement fitted to R.C. gears
 
Doncaster Works 24/05/1935 31/05/1935 8 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 20/12/1935 20/12/1935 1 day Heavy  
Doncaster Works 27/05/1936 07/07/1936 42 days General  
Doncaster Works 15/04/1937 14/05/1937 30 days General  
Doncaster Works 21/05/1938 03/06/1938 14 days Light Repair
New middle con rod
 
Doncaster Works 13/09/1938 15/09/1938 3 days Light Repair
Boiler repairs
 
Doncaster Works 30/09/1938 14/04/1938 -168 days General
Rebuilt & streamlined
 
Cowlairs Works 25/03/1939 25/03/1939 1 day Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 01/07/1939 19/08/1939 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 30/12/1939 13/01/1940 15 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 13/07/1940 17/08/1940 36 days General  
Cowlairs Works 13/12/1940 20/12/1940 8 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 04/04/1941 05/04/1941 2 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 07/03/1942 25/04/1942 50 days General  
Cowlairs Works 16/10/1943 16/10/1943 1 day Heavy  
Cowlairs Works 25/04/1944 25/04/1944 1 day Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 24/06/1944 14/09/1944 83 days Heavy
Rebuilt to class A2/2
 
Cowlairs Works 22/09/1945 06/10/1945 15 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 30/03/1946 04/05/1946 36 days General  
Cowlairs Works 25/05/1946 15/06/1946 22 days Light Repair
Green painting for exhibition in Edinburgh
 
Cowlairs Works 12/11/1946 04/07/1947 235 days Heavy  
Cowlairs Works 29/01/1948 30/01/1948 2 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 23/02/1949 09/04/1949 46 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 02/01/1950 21/02/1950 51 days General  
Doncaster Works 05/01/1951 16/02/1951 43 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 19/03/1951 21/03/1951 3 days Special
Special exam after Balby bridge accident
 
Doncaster Works 17/09/1952 24/10/1952 38 days General
Boiler number 9661 (Diagram 118)
 
Doncaster Works 02/04/1953 02/04/1953 1 day Weighing  
Doncaster Works 12/06/1953 17/07/1953 36 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 29/10/1953 07/11/1953 10 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 18/02/1954 25/02/1954 8 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 15/03/1954 19/03/1954 5 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 01/04/1954 07/04/1954 7 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 12/05/1954 20/05/1954 9 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 18/08/1954 28/09/1954 42 days General
Boiler number 29807 (Diagram 118)
 
Doncaster Works 29/11/1954 10/12/1954 12 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 08/08/1956 28/09/1956 52 days General
Boiler number 29876 (Diagram 118)
 
Doncaster Works 11/12/1957 19/12/1957 9 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 14/03/1958 22/03/1958 9 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 05/06/1958 12/06/1958 8 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 17/09/1958 23/10/1958 37 days General
Boiler number 29807 (Diagram 118)
 
Doncaster Works 10/02/1959 12/02/1959 3 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 22/01/1960 22/01/1960 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/05/1934 To Service To service as LNER Number 2001, name: COCK O' THE NORTH
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1789
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 106 boiler fitted
   
31/07/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
24/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/08/1934. Dep: 27/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Tablet apparatus fitted
   
10/09/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/09/1934. Dep: 17/09/1934.
Work undertaken:
New L H Piston
   
01/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/11/1934. Dep: 24/11/1934.
Work undertaken:
Prepared for visit to Vitry
   
21/02/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
23/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1935. Dep: 30/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
New oil cooling arrgangement fitted to R.C. gears
   
24/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/05/1935. Dep: 31/05/1935.    
20/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/12/1935. Dep: 20/12/1935.    
27/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1936. Dep: 07/07/1936.    
15/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1937. Dep: 14/05/1937.    
21/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/05/1938. Dep: 03/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
New middle con rod
   
13/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/09/1938. Dep: 15/09/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler repairs
   
30/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1938. Dep: 14/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt & streamlined
   
25/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/03/1939. Dep: 25/03/1939.    
01/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1939. Dep: 19/08/1939.    
30/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/12/1939. Dep: 13/01/1940.    
13/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1940. Dep: 17/08/1940.    
13/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/12/1940. Dep: 20/12/1940.    
04/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/04/1941. Dep: 05/04/1941.    
07/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1942. Dep: 25/04/1942.    
16/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/10/1943. Dep: 16/10/1943.    
25/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/04/1944. Dep: 25/04/1944.    
24/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 24/06/1944. Dep: 14/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class A2/2
   
29/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
22/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/09/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 990 but not taken up    
30/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946.    
25/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/05/1946. Dep: 15/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Green painting for exhibition in Edinburgh
   
11/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 501    
12/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/11/1946. Dep: 04/07/1947.    
29/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/01/1948. Dep: 30/01/1948.    
22/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 60501    
23/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/02/1949. Dep: 09/04/1949.    
04/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
27/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
02/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1950. Dep: 21/02/1950.    
27/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
17/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
05/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/01/1951. Dep: 16/02/1951.    
19/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Special) - Arr: 19/03/1951. Dep: 21/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Special exam after Balby bridge accident
   
17/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1952. Dep: 24/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9661 (Diagram 118)
   
02/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 02/04/1953. Dep: 02/04/1953.    
12/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/06/1953. Dep: 17/07/1953.    
29/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/10/1953. Dep: 07/11/1953.    
18/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/02/1954. Dep: 25/02/1954.    
15/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/03/1954. Dep: 19/03/1954.    
01/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/04/1954. Dep: 07/04/1954.    
12/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/05/1954. Dep: 20/05/1954.    
18/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1954. Dep: 28/09/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29807 (Diagram 118)
   
29/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/11/1954. Dep: 10/12/1954.    
08/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1956. Dep: 28/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29876 (Diagram 118)
   
11/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/12/1957. Dep: 19/12/1957.    
14/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/03/1958. Dep: 22/03/1958.    
05/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/06/1958. Dep: 12/06/1958.    
17/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1958. Dep: 23/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29807 (Diagram 118)
   
10/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/02/1959. Dep: 12/02/1959.    
22/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 22/01/1960. Dep: 22/01/1960.    
08/02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 60501 from York (North) (50A)    

prev prev