Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 256 Today
» 1084 Yesterday
» 256 Week
» 30546 Month
» 333736 Year
» 1555301 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2003 on 13/06/1936
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 992 on Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 503   30/06/1946
British Railways 60503   18/09/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
13/06/1936 LORD PRESIDENT

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class A2
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
P2/213/06/1936
A2/217/12/1944
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 612
Works Number 1836
To Service Fri 13/06/1936 to Haymarket (HAY)
Withdrawal Fri 27/11/1959 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 23 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Cut-up Doncaster Works

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HAY Haymarket (New) on 13/06/1936
DEE Dundee Tay Bridge on 04/09/1936
HAY Haymarket on 23/10/1942
91N To North Eastern Region on 27/11/1942
HAY Haymarket on 20/03/1944
KX Kings Cross on 17/12/1944
GHD Gateshead on 02/02/1945
HAY Haymarket on 20/03/1945
KX Kings Cross on 11/04/1945
HAY Haymarket on 13/05/1945
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill on 17/05/1948
HAY Haymarket on 26/05/1948
YK York (North) on 27/11/1949
50B Neville Hill on 27/11/1950
50A York (North) on 17/12/1950
   Withdrawn on 27/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill w/e 22/05/1948
ALLOC HAY Haymarket w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 50A York (North) m/e 31/12/1950
WDN   on 27/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
13/06/1936 Diagram 106 boiler fitted (number 8796)
12/12/1942 Diagram 106 boiler fitted (number 8785)
17/12/1944 Diagram 106A boiler fitted (number 8785)
04/02/1955 Diagram 106A boiler fitted (number 29770)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Cowlairs Works 06/10/1936 15/10/1936 10 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 27/05/1937 04/06/1937 9 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 29/07/1937 09/08/1937 12 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 11/03/1938 09/04/1938 30 days General  
Cowlairs Works 25/05/1938 28/05/1938 4 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 08/06/1938 15/06/1938 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 13/09/1938 27/09/1938 15 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 03/06/1939 15/07/1939 43 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 09/09/1939 04/11/1939 57 days General  
Cowlairs Works 25/05/1940 30/05/1940 6 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 18/01/1941 08/03/1941 50 days General  
Cowlairs Works 18/08/1941 21/08/1941 4 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 23/09/1941 04/10/1941 12 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 07/02/1942 21/03/1942 43 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 10/10/1942 12/12/1942 64 days General
Boiler number 8785 (Diagram 106)
 
Cowlairs Works 04/03/1943 08/03/1943 5 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 02/09/1944 17/12/1944 107 days Heavy
Rebuilt to class A2/2
Boiler number 29772 (Diagram 106A)
 
Doncaster Works 30/12/1944 30/12/1944 1 day Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 17/03/1945 17/03/1945 1 day Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 15/06/1945 27/06/1945 13 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 29/08/1945 31/08/1945 3 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 22/10/1945 03/11/1945 13 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 09/11/1945 12/11/1945 4 days Light Repair  
Inverurie Works 23/11/1945 23/11/1945 1 day Weighing  
Cowlairs Works 06/07/1946 21/12/1946 169 days Heavy  
Cowlairs Works 27/06/1947 12/07/1947 16 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 09/08/1948 18/09/1948 41 days General
Renumbered to BR 60503
 
Cowlairs Works 27/10/1948 30/10/1948 4 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 10/05/1949 13/05/1949 4 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 30/11/1949 20/12/1949 21 days Light Casual
Bogie exam after derailment
 
Doncaster Works 24/07/1950 31/08/1950 39 days General  
Doncaster Works 25/10/1950 26/10/1950 2 days Weighing  
Doncaster Works 20/02/1951 13/03/1951 22 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 05/03/1952 02/04/1952 29 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 22/04/1952 02/05/1952 11 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 20/11/1952 10/12/1952 21 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 06/11/1953 23/11/1953 18 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 21/01/1954 28/01/1954 8 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 26/05/1954 09/06/1954 15 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 30/12/1954 04/02/1955 37 days General
Boiler number 29770 (Diagram 106A)
 
Doncaster Works 17/10/1955 15/11/1955 30 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 12/01/1956 27/01/1956 16 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 04/12/1956 04/12/1956 1 day Weighing  
Doncaster Works 07/06/1957 26/07/1957 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 27/05/1958 06/06/1958 11 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 20/10/1958 12/11/1958 24 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 20/02/1959 14/03/1959 23 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 27/11/1959 27/11/1959 1 day No repairs  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/06/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 60503/06, 61002, 1260/1/2, 1742/66/93, 61998, 2402/40/60, 4594, 4617/26, 4818/58, 65933, 7480/91, 67631, 8104, 9209, 69500/10, 9553, 69565, Class '8' 73799, 77031, 77431/42/76, ex L.M.S. Nos. 44994, 16156. SLS/194907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/06/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2003, name: LORD PRESIDENT
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1836
Allocated to Haymarket (HAY)
Diagram 106 boiler fitted
   
04/09/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE)    
06/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/10/1936. Dep: 15/10/1936.    
27/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/05/1937. Dep: 04/06/1937.    
29/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/07/1937. Dep: 09/08/1937.    
11/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1938. Dep: 09/04/1938.    
25/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/05/1938. Dep: 28/05/1938.    
08/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/06/1938. Dep: 15/06/1938.    
13/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/09/1938. Dep: 27/09/1938.    
03/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/06/1939. Dep: 15/07/1939.    
09/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1939. Dep: 04/11/1939.    
25/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/05/1940. Dep: 30/05/1940.    
18/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1941. Dep: 08/03/1941.    
18/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/08/1941. Dep: 21/08/1941.    
23/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/09/1941. Dep: 04/10/1941.    
07/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/02/1942. Dep: 21/03/1942.    
10/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1942. Dep: 12/12/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8785 (Diagram 106)
   
23/10/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
27/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N)    
04/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/03/1943. Dep: 08/03/1943.    
20/03/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
02/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 02/09/1944. Dep: 17/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class A2/2
Boiler number 29772 (Diagram 106A)
   
17/12/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
30/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/12/1944. Dep: 30/12/1944.    
02/02/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
17/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/03/1945. Dep: 17/03/1945.    
20/03/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
11/04/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
13/05/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
15/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/06/1945. Dep: 27/06/1945.    
29/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/08/1945. Dep: 31/08/1945.    
22/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/10/1945. Dep: 03/11/1945.    
09/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/11/1945. Dep: 12/11/1945.    
23/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Weighing) - Arr: 23/11/1945. Dep: 23/11/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 992 but not taken up    
30/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 503    
06/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/07/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946.    
27/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/06/1947. Dep: 12/07/1947.    
17/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
26/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
09/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1948. Dep: 18/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 60503
   
27/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/10/1948. Dep: 30/10/1948.    
10/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/05/1949. Dep: 13/05/1949.    
27/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
30/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/11/1949. Dep: 20/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Bogie exam after derailment
   
24/07/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1950. Dep: 31/08/1950.    
25/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 25/10/1950. Dep: 26/10/1950.    
27/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
17/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
20/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/02/1951. Dep: 13/03/1951.    
05/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/03/1952. Dep: 02/04/1952.    
22/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/04/1952. Dep: 02/05/1952.    
20/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/11/1952. Dep: 10/12/1952.    
06/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/11/1953. Dep: 23/11/1953.    
21/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/01/1954. Dep: 28/01/1954.    
26/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/05/1954. Dep: 09/06/1954.    
30/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1954. Dep: 04/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29770 (Diagram 106A)
   
17/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/10/1955. Dep: 15/11/1955.    
12/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/01/1956. Dep: 27/01/1956.    
04/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 04/12/1956. Dep: 04/12/1956.    
07/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1957. Dep: 26/07/1957.    
27/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/05/1958. Dep: 06/06/1958.    
20/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/10/1958. Dep: 12/11/1958.    
20/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/02/1959. Dep: 14/03/1959.    
27/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 60503 from York (North) (50A)    
27/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 27/11/1959. Dep: 27/11/1959.    

prev prev